Smith v. Department of Justice
Plaintiff: Afelica Smith
Defendant: Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2021mi00083
Filed: October 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 3410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/2/2021. (adg)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this action be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute re #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 12/2/2021. (adg)
December 2, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Afelica Smith re #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #5 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (adg)
November 16, 2021 Submission of #3 Order, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (adg)
November 3, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Afelica Smith re #3 Order. (jkb)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to submit an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis and an amended motion that complies with 12 U.S.C. 3410(a) within 10 days of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended application or upon the expiration of the time to file such application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 11/02/2021. (jkb)
November 2, 2021 Submission of #2 Order, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jkb)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff to submit an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis within 14 days of this order. Plaintiff is further ORDERED to submit an amended motion that complies with the statute, including an affidavit or sworn statement as required by 12 U.S.C. 3410(a), and the motion and supporting documents should be served upon the Government pursuant to such statute. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to the undersigned upon receipt of Plaintiff's amended application or upon the expiration of the time to file such application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 10/14/2021. (adg)
October 14, 2021 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Afelica Smith re #2 Order. (adg)
October 12, 2021 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
October 8, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Afelica Smith. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Order, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afelica Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?