Sunderland et al v. Okland
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sunderland and James Farrow
Debtor: Dean Okland
Case Number: 1:2021mi00102
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1963
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2022 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $631,128.24. Original writ mailed to attorney via US Mail to address on writ (CMRR #91 7199 9991 7032 5718 5413) (adg) Modified on 1/20/2022 (adg).
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 First NOTICE to Take Deposition of Dean Okland filed by Jennifer Sunderland (Evins, Richard)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Writ of Writ of Execution by Jennifer Sunderland. (Evins, Richard)
December 10, 2021 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (eop)
December 8, 2021 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment filed by James Farrow and Jennifer Sunderland. Judgment entered in favor of Jennifer Sunderland and James Farrow and against Dean Okland in the total amount of $631,128.24) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
December 8, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11445618 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunderland et al v. Okland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Dean Okland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Sunderland
Represented By: Richard Ferrell Evins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Farrow
Represented By: Richard Ferrell Evins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?