Gill v. First Continental Bank
Plaintiff: Manjit Singh Gill and Manjit Singh
Defendant: First Continental Bank
Case Number: 1:2021mi00105
Filed: December 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: On January 19, 2022, Plaintiff filed a notice of withdrawal of the motion to compel #6 . In light of Plaintiff's withdrawal and because there are no further matters pending before this Court, the clerk is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 1/21/22. (jra) Modified on 1/21/2022 to edit text(jra).
January 20, 2022 Submission of #2 Order, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (hfm)
January 19, 2022 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (adg)
January 19, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE by Manjit Singh Gill re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena of Withdrawal (Bushnell, Vincent)
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena Affidavit of Jack Byun filed by First Continental Bank. (Malone, C.) Modified on 1/20/2022 (adg)(DUPLICATE FILING) .
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 Affidavit of Jack Byun re RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena filed by First Continental Bank. (Malone, C.) Modified on 1/20/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Compel Subpoena filed by First Continental Bank. (Malone, C.)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Defendant and Respondent to file any response to the #1 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Subpoena. The failure to file a response will indicate that there is no opposition to the motion. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this matter to me on January 18, 2022. Counsel for Plaintiff is DIRECTED to provide a copy of this order, via electronic mail, to defense counsel and Respondent. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 1/3/2022. (anc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to CompelCompliance with Subpoena with Declaration In Support by Manjit Singh Gill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -Jacko Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
December 14, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11457754 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gill v. First Continental Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manjit Singh Gill
Represented By: Vincent C. Bushnell
Represented By: John J. Jacko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manjit Singh
Represented By: Vincent C. Bushnell
Represented By: John J. Jacko, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Continental Bank
Represented By: C. Cyrus Malone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?