Walgreen Co. v. Peters
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Defendant: Aaron Peters
Petitioner: L2 Partners LLC, L2B Invest, L2B Partners LLC, L2 Chile 1 LLC, Apollo Development, LLC, LJL Holdings 1 LLC, LJL Holdings 2 LLC, TKG Equity LLC, Lance Lazarus, Dan Marotta, Jeff Richards, John Shumrak and Tad Galin
Case Number: 1:2021mi00107
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Regina D Cannon
Referring Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Miscellaneous Case Terminated. Make all future filing in 1:22-cv-00385-LMM-RDC. (adg)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Motion to Quash Subpoena and Notice of Withdrawal of Subpoena and Request for Dismissal filed by Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, December 17 Correspondence, #2 Exhibit 2, Amended Dropbox Subpoena)(Pernini, David) Modified on 1/31/2022 to correct docket text (adg).
January 25, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel Warren Rice Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11527714).. Attorney Joel W. Rice added appearing on behalf of Apollo Development, LLC, Tad Galin, L2 Partners LLC, Lance Lazarus, Dan Marotta, Jeff Richards, John Shumrak, TKG Equity LLC (cdg)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission of Joel Warren Rice Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 1/25/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Walgreens will file its response to the pending motion no later than January 28, 2022. Movants shall file a reply no later than February 11, 2022. At any time prior to the completion of briefing, either party may request a telephone conference with the Court through the undersigned's courtroom deputy. Even in the absence of such a request, the undersigned may sua sponte schedule a conference with the parties if a decision on the subpoena dispute may profit from further discussion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 1/24/2022. (anc)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Walgreen Co.. (Pernini, David)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Joel Warren Rice Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11527714).by Apollo Development, LLC, Tad Galin, L2 Chile 1 LLC, L2 Partners LLC, L2B Invest, L2B Partners LLC, LJL Holdings 1 LLC, LJL Holdings 2 LLC, Lance Lazarus, Dan Marotta, Jeff Richards, John Shumrak, TKG Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Simpson, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Rudolph Simpson on behalf of Apollo Development, LLC, Tad Galin, L2 Chile 1 LLC, L2 Partners LLC, L2B Invest, L2B Partners LLC, LJL Holdings 1 LLC, LJL Holdings 2 LLC, Lance Lazarus, Dan Marotta, Jeff Richards, John Shumrak, TKG Equity LLC (Simpson, Matthew)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Joel W. Rice. Clerk to follow-up by 1/24/2022. (cdg)
December 20, 2021 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena; and MOTION for Protective Order, to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (eop)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena; and MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Apollo Development, LLC, Tad Galin, L2 Chile 1 LLC, L2 Partners LLC, L2B Invest, L2B Partners LLC, LJL Holdings 1 LLC, LJL Holdings 2 LLC, Lance Lazarus, Dan Marotta, Jeff Richards, John Shumrak and, TKG Equity LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -A, #3 Exhibit -B, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
December 17, 2021 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11466953 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walgreen Co. v. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: David M. Pernini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L2 Partners LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L2B Invest
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L2B Partners LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: L2 Chile 1 LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Apollo Development, LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LJL Holdings 1 LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LJL Holdings 2 LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TKG Equity LLC
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lance Lazarus
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dan Marotta
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeff Richards
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Shumrak
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tad Galin
Represented By: Joel W. Rice
Represented By: Matthew Rudolph Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?