McGowan et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Frank McGowan and Paula McGowan
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00162
Filed: January 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery shall be on a six-month track and ends on 8/15/2022. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on March 2, 2022. (ash)
March 2, 2022 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons and #5 Certificate of Interested Persons reviewed and approved by SDG. (ash)
March 1, 2022 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Glickauf, Stephanie)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Initial Disclosures by Frank McGowan, Paula McGowan.(Fuller, Stephen)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Frank McGowan, Paula McGowan. (Fuller, Stephen)
February 14, 2022 Filing 4 Initial Disclosures by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ATTACHMENT A to Defendants Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit ATTACHMENT B to Defendants Initial Disclosures, #3 Exhibit ATTACHMENT C to Defendants Initial Disclosures, #4 Exhibit ATTACHMENT E to Defendants Initial Disclosures)(Kerechanin, Karen)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Kerechanin, Karen)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(Kerechanin, Karen) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11516302) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B -State Court Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGowan et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank McGowan
Represented By: Stephen Paul Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula McGowan
Represented By: Stephen Paul Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen Jean Kerechanin
Represented By: Stephanie F. Glickauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?