Watson v. Omega RMS, LLC
Plaintiff: Pamela J Watson
Defendant: Omega RMS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00170
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Referring Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omega RMS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Juggernaut Funding Corporation for Omega RMS, LLC. (Aust, Jonathan)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Omega RMS, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/5/2022.(Aust, Jonathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 8, 2022 Clerks Notation re #9 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omega RMS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Juggernaut Funding Corporation for Omega RMS, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #6 unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant Omega RMS, LLC shall have through and including March 8, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 02/16/2022. (nlj) (nlj)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with Brief In Support by Omega RMS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aust, Jonathan)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan K. Aust on behalf of Omega RMS, LLC (Aust, Jonathan)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Pamela J Watson. Omega RMS, LLC served on 2/1/2022, answer due 2/22/2022. (Lemberg, Sergei)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Pamela J Watson. (eop)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Omega RMS, LLC. (eop)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Pamela J Watson. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11518216) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 1/14/2022 (eop).
January 14, 2022 Clerks Notation re #3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Pamela Watson. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Omega RMS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela J Watson
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega RMS, LLC
Represented By: John H. Bedard, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan K. Aust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?