Grier-Calhoun v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Norma Grier-Calhoun
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00172
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: John K Larkins
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Raborn, Jane Ashley)
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Discovery ends on 7/29/2022.(Raborn, Jane Ashley) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER by docket entry only granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s answer or other response to the complaint will be due no later than 3/1/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 2/2/2022. (emm)
January 29, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Raborn, Jane Ashley)
January 14, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by Norma Grier-Calhoun. (eop) Modified on 1/31/2022 to edit filer information. (cmd)
January 14, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (eop)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Norma Grier-Calhoun. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11518813) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grier-Calhoun v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Grier-Calhoun
Represented By: Jenna Dakroub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jane Ashley Raborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?