Coleman v. Department Store National Bank: DSNB Macy's
Plaintiff: Horatius Coleman
Defendant: Department Store National Bank: DSNB Macy's
Case Number: 1:2022cv00178
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Alan J Baverman
Referring Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 Personal Service Package prepared and forwarded to USM for service upon Department Store National Bank: DSNB Macy's. (emailed to Atlanta Division for placement in USM box) (tmf)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Department Store National Bank: DSNB Macy's. (tmf)
January 31, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Horatius Coleman re #4 Notice to Pro Se Parties. (tmf)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Plaintiffs Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 1/28/2022. (tmf)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED TO FORWARD sufficient USM 285 Forms to Plaintiff. Upon receipt, Plaintiff is ORDERED to complete the forms and return them to the Clerk within TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS of the date of this Order, so that process may be served upon Defendant. No further action will occur in this case until Plaintiff returns the completed forms to the Clerk. Upon receipt of the forms by the Clerk, the Clerk is DIRECTED to prepare and transmit to the U.S. Marshal's Service service packages for Defendant. The service packages must include the USM 285 form, the summons, and one (1) copy of the complaint. Upon receipt of the service packages, the U.S. Marshals Service is DIRECTED to serve Defendant. The completed USM 285 forms shall be filed with the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 1/25/2022. (tmf)
January 25, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Horatius Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
January 25, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Horatius Coleman re #3 Order ruling on IFP, 1 USM 285, 1 summons. (tmf)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Horatius Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
January 14, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Department Store National Bank: DSNB Macy's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Horatius Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Store National Bank: DSNB Macy's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?