Shannon v. LM General Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Tina Shannon
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00188
Filed: January 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 Initial Disclosures by LM General Insurance Company.(Minter, Mary)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #6 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Before the Court is the parties' Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan (Dkt. #6 ) (the Plan). Having considered the Plan, it is hereby APPROVED. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court, except as herein modified: This case is assigned to a six-month discovery track. Discovery shall be completed on or before August 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/8/2022. (tmf)
February 4, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for LM General Insurance Company's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by LM General Insurance Company.(Minter, Mary)
February 4, 2022 Filing 6 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Minter, Mary)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by LM General Insurance Company. (Hunter, Hilary)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
January 17, 2022 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Persons by LM General Insurance Company. (lwb)
January 17, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint and #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LM General Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 6/17/2022.(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 1/18/2022 to correct file date (lwb).
January 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11520655) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shannon v. LM General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Shannon
Represented By: Foster Peebles
Represented By: J. Remington Huggins
Represented By: Michael Davis Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Brent J. Kaplan
Represented By: Hilary Wayne Hunter
Represented By: Mary T. Minter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?