United Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Gorrell et al
Plaintiff: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Walter J. Gorrell, Green Implementation Group, LLC and Real Estate Acquisition and Development, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00260
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief PLAINTIFF UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Statement of Material Facts PLAINTIFF UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #3 Statement of Material Facts PLAINTIFF UNITED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANYS STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Nelson, Alphonsie) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.--
February 24, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Non-Service , as to REAL ESTATE ACQUISITION AND DEVELOPMENT, LLC c/o Alexei Mikhailov. (Nelson, Alphonsie) Modified on 2/25/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 24, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Non-Service as to Green Implementation Group, LLC c/o Alexei Mikhailov. (Nelson, Alphonsie) Modified on 2/24/2022 to edit text (jra). Modified on 2/25/2022 to edit text(jra).
January 26, 2022 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp (UIHC) for United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Nelson, Alphonsie)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Real Estate Acquisition and Development, LLC. (eop)
January 21, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Green Implementation Group, LLC. (eop)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Walter J. Gorrell. (eop)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United Property & Casualty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number CGANDC-11534312) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company v. Gorrell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alphonsie Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter J. Gorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Implementation Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Estate Acquisition and Development, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?