Grant v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Audrey Lynn Grant
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC and Fortiva Financial, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00320
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Referring Judge: J Clay Fuller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Settlement AS TO FORTIVA FINANCIAL, LLC by Audrey Lynn Grant (Berry, Matthew)
February 7, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Audrey Lynn Grant. Equifax Information Services LLC waiver mailed on 1/28/2022, answer due 3/29/2022. (Berry, Matthew)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by Audrey Lynn Grant. (Berry, Matthew)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Audrey Lynn Grant. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11545564) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Lynn Grant
Represented By: Christopher Neil Armor
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortiva Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?