Owners Insurance Company v. Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC, Parts South of Georgia, Inc., Jason L. McCard, Edwin Dale Adams, Russel K. Perry and Joseph R. Veitch
Case Number: 1:2022cv00352
Filed: January 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2022 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Edwin Dale Adams, Jason L. McCard, Parts South of Georgia, Inc., Russel K. Perry, Joseph R. Veitch.(Pardue, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 11, 2022 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC. Discovery ends on 8/8/2022.(Cartwright, Wayne) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Edwin Dale Adams Answer due 3/18/2022; Jason L. McCard Answer due 3/18/2022; Parts South of Georgia, Inc. Answer due 3/18/2022; Russel K. Perry Answer due 3/18/2022; Joseph R. Veitch Answer due 3/18/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/7/2022. (dob)
March 3, 2022 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Edwin Dale Adams, Jason L. McCard, Parts South of Georgia, Inc., Russel K. Perry, Joseph R. Veitch. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pardue, David)
March 2, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian David Stoltz on behalf of Edwin Dale Adams, Jason L. McCard, Parts South of Georgia, Inc., Russel K. Perry, Joseph R. Veitch (Stoltz, Brian)
March 2, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Pardue on behalf of Edwin Dale Adams, Jason L. McCard, Parts South of Georgia, Inc., Russel K. Perry, Joseph R. Veitch (Pardue, David)
February 28, 2022 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Parts South of Georgia, Inc. served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 28, 2022 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Joseph R. Veitch served on 2/24/2022, answer due 3/17/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 23, 2022 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Edwin Dale Adams served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 23, 2022 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Russel K. Perry served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC served on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Parts South of Georgia, Inc. served on 2/11/2022, answer due 3/4/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Jason L. McCard served on 2/13/2022, answer due 3/7/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
January 31, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Kendall, Michael)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2022. (jpk)
January 28, 2022 Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC. (kxm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Russel K. Perry. (kxm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Parts South of Georgia, Inc. (kxm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Joseph R. Veitch. (kxm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Jason L. McCard. (kxm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Edwin Dale Adams. (kxm)
January 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Owners Insurance Company (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11551496) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in UL, #2 Exhibit B - Amended Complaint in UL, #3 Exhibit C - Complete Parts policies, #4 Exhibit D - Parts South policy, #5 Exhibit E - Reservation of rights ltr, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tidewater Fleet Supply, LLC
Represented By: Wayne M. Cartwright, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parts South of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Represented By: David L. Pardue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason L. McCard
Represented By: David L. Pardue
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Dale Adams
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Represented By: David L. Pardue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel K. Perry
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Represented By: David L. Pardue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph R. Veitch
Represented By: Brian David Stoltz
Represented By: David L. Pardue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?