Grange Insurance Company v. Formula Construction Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Defendant: Formula Construction Group, LLC and Natalie Appelt
Case Number: 1:2022cv00374
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 18 Initial Disclosures by Formula Construction Group, LLC.(Lacy, William)
March 30, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by Formula Construction Group, LLC. (Lacy, William)
March 28, 2022 Filing 16 Initial Disclosures by Natalie Appelt.(Oliverio, Justin)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER re: #14 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The parties' request for an eight-month discovery period is GRANTED. Discovery ends on 11/25/2022. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 3/24/2022. (anc)
March 24, 2022 Filing 14 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Grange Insurance Company. (Sprinkle, Brian)
March 24, 2022 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Grange Insurance Company.(Sprinkle, Brian)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Natalie Appelt. (Oliverio, Justin) Text Modified on 3/15/2022 (kxm).
March 14, 2022 Filing 11 Defendant Appelt's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Natalie Appelt.(Oliverio, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
March 10, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grange Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Grange Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Grange Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Grange Insurance Company.(Sprinkle, Brian)Text Modified on 3/11/2022 (kxm).
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Formula Construction Group, LLC. Discovery ends on 7/25/2022.(Lacy, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 22, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Lee Oliverio on behalf of Natalie Appelt (Oliverio, Justin)
February 22, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce R. Millar on behalf of Natalie Appelt (Millar, Bruce)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Natalie Appelt. All Parties. (Millar, Bruce)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Natalie Appelt. All Parties. (Oliverio, Justin)
February 8, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Grange Insurance Company. Formula Construction Group, LLC served on 2/2/2022, answer due 2/23/2022. (Sprinkle, Brian) Modified docket text on 2/9/2022 (bgt).
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Natalie Appelt. (eop)
January 31, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Formula Construction Group, LLC. (eop)
January 31, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Grange Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11555676) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Policy, #2 Exhibit -B -Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C -First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit -D -Affidavit of Service -Formula Construction, #5 Exhibit -E -Joint Motion to Substitute Defendant ECI, #6 Exhibit -F -Notice of Leave of Absence, #7 Exhibit -G -Motion for Default Judgment against Formula, #8 Exhibit -H -Final Judgment, #9 Exhibit -I -Email and letter providing first notice to Grange, #10 Exhibit -J -Reservation of Rights letter, #11 Exhibit -K -Supplemental Reservation of Rights letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Insurance Company v. Formula Construction Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian Winfred Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formula Construction Group, LLC
Represented By: William Thomas Lacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Appelt
Represented By: Bruce R. Millar
Represented By: Justin Lee Oliverio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?