Owners Insurance Company v. Robertson et al
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: Judy Robertson, John Rogers Renovations, Inc. and John Rogers
Case Number: 1:2022cv00409
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Amended Pleadings due by 5/3/2022. Discovery ends on 7/29/2022. Motions due by 8/29/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/29/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 4/1/2022. (jra)
March 31, 2022 Filing 15 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Kendall, Michael)
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 Initial Disclosures by Owners Insurance Company.(Kendall, Michael)
March 3, 2022 Clerks Notation re #13 Leave of Absence Richard Edward Witterman, Jr. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance Richard Edward Witterman, Jr. on these dates. (jeh)
March 3, 2022 Clerks Notation re #12 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
March 2, 2022 Filing 13 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 4, March 18-22, March 25-28, April 8-11, May 25-27, September 23-26, October 14-17, November 23-25, December 23-January 2, 2023, by Richard Edward Witterman, Jr. (Witterman, Richard) Modified on 3/3/2022 to edit text (jra).
March 1, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Interested Persons & Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Rogers Renovations, Inc. & John Rogers (Witterman, Richard) Modified on 3/2/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 1, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by John Rogers Renovations, Inc.(Witterman, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/2/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by John Rogers. Discovery ends on 7/29/2022.(Witterman, Richard) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 3/2/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 14, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. Judy Robertson served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. John Rogers Renovations, Inc. served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 14, 2022 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed by Owners Insurance Company. John Rogers served on 2/9/2022, answer due 3/2/2022. (Kendall, Michael)
February 4, 2022 Clerks Notation re #5 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
February 4, 2022 Clerks Notation re #6 Leave of Absence by Michael C. Kendall. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by Michael C. Kendall on these dates. (jeh)
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): April 4, 2022 through and including April 14, 2022; June 17, 2022 through and including June 27, 2022; September 1, 2022 through and including September 12, 2022; November 18, 2022 through and including November 28, 2022; December 23, 2022 through and including January 2, 2023, by Michael C. Kendall. (Kendall, Michael)
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Owners Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Kendall, Michael)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to John Rogers. (eop)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to John Rogers Renovations, Inc.. (eop)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Judy Robertson. (eop)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11560247) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit -B -Policy, #3 Exhibit -C -ROR Ltr, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owners Insurance Company v. Robertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: John Christian Kendall
Represented By: Michael C. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rogers Renovations, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Edward Witterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rogers
Represented By: Richard Edward Witterman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?