110 SUNPORT LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: 110 SUNPORT LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Case Number: 1:2022cv00456
Filed: February 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REGARDING IHG LICENSEE CLASS ACTIONS AND CASE CONSOLIDATION. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/23/22. (bnw)
March 22, 2022 Filing 42 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by 110 SUNPORT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Case Consolidation)(Gibson, MaryBeth)
February 21, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC Notice and Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel (Coleman, Ronald)
February 18, 2022 Filing 40 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Leslie McCarthy Apodaca. Clerk to follow-up by 2/28/2022. (nmb)
February 18, 2022 Filing 39 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Abigail M. Yates. Clerk to follow-up by 2/28/2022. (nmb)
February 18, 2022 Filing 38 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mark Fishbein. Clerk to follow-up by 2/28/2022. (nmb)
February 18, 2022 Filing 37 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Andrew P. Bleiman. Clerk to follow-up by 2/28/2022. (nmb)
February 18, 2022 Filing 36 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Kristina Martinez. Clerk to follow-up by 2/28/2022. (nmb)
February 4, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
February 4, 2022 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of New Mexico; Case Number 1:21-cv-00844. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 UNOPPOSED ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough. (kfo) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
February 3, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION and Consent Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
December 14, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
November 23, 2021 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
November 4, 2021 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC. (Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 25, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing of Defendants' Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss by 110 SUNPORT LLC (Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 21 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, 20 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Case by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 24 DECLARATION by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Ref. Doc. 22 Order to Exceed Page Limits by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter granting #18 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to Excess Page Limits on Motion to Dismiss. Defendants may file a motion to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint not to exceed 40 pages. (cd) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 21 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 7, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), 110 SUNPORT LLC voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONSENT SUBMISSION DEADLINE: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 7 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. (kfo)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of All Defendants (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 16 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of: Anne H. Baroody Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP 303 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 3600Atlanta, GA 30308 (404) 420-4326 Fax (404) 523-5300 abaroody@phrd.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of All Defendants (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 14 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of: Jared C. Miller Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP 303 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 3600Atlanta, GA 30308 (404) 420-5564 Fax (404) 522-8409 jmiller@phrd.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Defendants Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of: Ronald T. Coleman Parker, Hudson, Rainer & Dobbs, LLP 303 Peachtree Street N.E., Suite 3600Atlanta, GA 30308 (404) 420-1144 Fax (404) 803-8965 rcoleman@phrd.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Apodaca, Leslie)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7925773 re: # 12 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7925828 re: # 14 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 5, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7925849 re: # 16 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District,, filed by Six Continents Hotels, Inc., Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE for Extension of Time to File Answer by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Apodaca, Leslie) Modified on 10/5/2021 (arp). [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie McCarthy Apodaca on behalf of All Defendants (Apodaca, Leslie) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff 110 SUNPORT LLC by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Justin E. Proper White & Williams LLP 1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 1800Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19103-7395 (215) 864-7165 properj@whiteandwilliams.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff 110 SUNPORT LLC by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Mark Fishbein Marks & Klein, LLP 1363 Shermer Road, Ste 318Northbrook, Illinois, 60062 (312) 206-5162 mark@marksklein.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff 110 SUNPORT LLC by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Andrew P. Bleiman Marks & Klein, LLP 1363 Shermer Road, Ste 318Northbrook, Illinois, 60062 (312) 206-5162 andrew@marksklein.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff 110 SUNPORT LLC by Kristina Martinez on behalf of: Justin Klein Marks & Klein, LLP 63 Riverside AvenueRed Bank, NJ 07701 (732) 747-7100 justin@marksklein.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Martinez, Kristina)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by 110 SUNPORT LLC Certification of Good Standing (Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 110 SUNPORT LLC as to Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 110 SUNPORT LLC as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7873369 re: # 6 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7873411 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7873405 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-7873376 re: # 7 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7861168 re #1 Complaint filed by 110 SUNPORT LLC (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Martinez, Kristina) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]
August 26, 2021 United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (arp) [Transferred from New Mexico on 2/4/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 110 SUNPORT LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 110 SUNPORT LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin E. Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: Kristina Martinez
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Abigail M. Yates
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Abigail M. Yates
Represented By: Leslie McCarthy Apodaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?