Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan v. Nowotny
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Defendant: Alexander F. Nowotny
Case Number: 1:2022cv00603
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Counsel are hereby ORDERED to file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan required by Local Rule 16.2 within 14 days of entry of this Order, or SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to LR 41.3. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/7/22. (vs)
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Persons by Alexander F. Nowotny. (Kinzinger, Alexandrea)
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Attorney Admission requirements sent to Alex P. Kinzinger. Clerk to follow-up by 3/14/2022. (nmb)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/14/2022. (bnp)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand, ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by Alexander F. Nowotny. Discovery ends on 7/11/2022.(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 11, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alexander F. Nowotnywith Jury Demand filed by Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan.(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Alexander F. Nowotny. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11587944) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan v. Nowotny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, Michigan
Represented By: Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander F. Nowotny
Represented By: Denise E. Weiner
Represented By: Alexandrea Kinzinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?