Williams v. United Van Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kashea Williams
Defendant: United Van Lines, LLC and John Doe
Petitioner: Unique Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00628
Filed: February 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Clerks Notation re #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
April 6, 2022 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Transportation Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Unigroup, C.A. for United Van Lines, LLC by United Van Lines, LLC.(Thompson, Philip) Modified on 4/7/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 31, 2022 Filing 13 Initial Disclosures by Kashea Williams.(Henshaw, Tim)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Defendant's Requests for Production of Documentary Evidence by United Van Lines, LLC.(Thompson, Philip) Modified on 3/29/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2022. Discovery ends on 9/14/2022. Motions due by 10/14/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/14/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2022. (jra)
March 15, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United Van Lines, LLC., Unique Insurance Company, and Kashea Williams (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 3/16/2022 to edit text(jra).
March 7, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim by United Van Lines, LLC.(Thompson, Philip) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions by United Van Lines, LLC.(Thompson, Philip)
February 24, 2022 Clerks Notation re #7 Leave of Absence by Nanette L. Wesley. Judge Thrash will not require an appearance by Nanette L. Wesley on these dates. (jeh)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following dates by Nanette L. Wesley: February 23, 2022 through February 28, 2022, June 18, 2022 through June 25, 2022, November 22, 2022 through December 10, 2022, December 24, 2022 through January 2, 2023 (Wesley, Nanette) Modified on 2/24/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE Of Filing State Court Answer by United Van Lines, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thompson, Philip)
February 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal to Federal Court by United Van Lines, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Thompson, Philip) Modified on 2/17/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Thompson on behalf of United Van Lines, LLC (Thompson, Philip)
February 15, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Civil Cover Sheet by Unique Insurance Company (Wesley, Nanette) Modified on 2/16/2022 to edit text(jra).
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL; and CROSSCLAIM against United Van Lines, LLC by Unique Insurance Company. ( Discovery ends on 7/14/2022.) (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Unique Insurance Company. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11592034) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. United Van Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kashea Williams
Represented By: Tim Henshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Van Lines, LLC
Represented By: Philip Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Unique Insurance Company
Represented By: Nanette L. Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?