YER USA, Inc. et al v. Walsh et al
Plaintiff: YER USA, Inc. and Camilla Daniels
Defendant: Martin J. Walsh and Yasheka Magloire
Case Number: 1:2022cv00698
Filed: February 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr.: The Court DENIED the #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction for the reasons stated on the record. Motion Hearing held on 4/14/2022. (Court Reporter Diane Peede)(jra)
April 1, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 2108 before Judge Thomas W. Thrash Jr. (jeh)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Yasheka Magloire, Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Screenshot of LCA Filing, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, Certified LCA)(Faso, Alessandra)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Weinstock. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
March 16, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Karen Weinstock re #7 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jra)
March 15, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen Weinstock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11651323).. Attorney Karen Weinstock added appearing on behalf of Camilla Daniels, YER USA, Inc. (nmb)
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alessandra Faso on behalf of Yasheka Magloire, Martin J. Walsh (Faso, Alessandra)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Karen Weinstock Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11651323).by Camilla Daniels, YER USA, Inc.. (Reeseman, Ariana) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Karen Weinstock. Clerk to follow-up by 3/21/2022. (nmb)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction with Brief In Support by Camilla Daniels and YER USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit)(Reeseman, Ariana) . Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 3/14/2022 (jra).
February 25, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Yasheka Magloire, Martin J. Walsh, & US Attorney (Attachments: #1 Summons Yasheka Magliore, #2 Summons Martin Walsh)(jra)
February 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by YER USA, Inc., Camilla Daniels. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11604224) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YER USA, Inc. et al v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YER USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ariana Lynne Reeseman
Represented By: Karen Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camilla Daniels
Represented By: Ariana Lynne Reeseman
Represented By: Karen Weinstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yasheka Magloire
Represented By: Alessandra Faso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?