Tran v. Jaddou
Plaintiff: Thao Thu Thuy Tran
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Case Number: 1:2022cv00796
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief. Ur Mendoza Jaddou Answer due 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 4/7/2022. (dob)
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file a responsive pleading re: #1 Complaint for Mandamus Relief,,, with Brief In Support by Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coty, Darcy) Modified on 4/7/2022 to edit event selected (dob).
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Thao Thu Thuy Tran. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 3/7/2022, answer due 5/6/2022. (Alwan, Zainab)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (eop)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Thao Thu Thuy Tran. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11614863) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Principal Plaintiff's Passport..., #2 Exhibit - Receipt for Form I-485 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit -Receipt for Form I-485 -Part 2, #4 Exhibit - Approval Notice of Form I-140, #5 Exhibit - Principal Plaintiffs Current and Previous Employment, #6 Exhibit - USCIS.gov Case Processing Times Report, #7 Exhibit - February 2022 Visa Bulletin, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 2/25/2022 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tran v. Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thao Thu Thuy Tran
Represented By: Zainab Alwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Represented By: Darcy F. Coty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?