Aaron Hotel Group, LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Aaron Hotel Group, LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group and IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00838
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 Filing 58 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
April 26, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Bethany Appleby as to IHG Owners Association, Inc. and Six Continents Hotels, Inc. regarding #58 Order. (mlb)
April 12, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Victoria M Calvert. Judge Eleanor L. Ross no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-CV-838-VMC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (bnw)
April 12, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Eleanor L. Ross. Judge Victoria M Calvert no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-838-ELR. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rvb)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REGARDING IHG LICENSEE CLASS ACTIONS AND CASE CONSOLIDATION. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 3/23/22. (bnw)
March 22, 2022 Filing 56 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Case Consolidation)(Gibson, MaryBeth)
March 11, 2022 Filing 55 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Bethany L. Appleby. Clerk to follow-up by 3/21/2022. (nmb)
March 11, 2022 Filing 54 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Justin E. Proper. Clerk to follow-up by 3/21/2022. (nmb)
March 1, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
March 1, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Attorney Anne Baroody as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC regarding #53 Order. (mlb)
February 28, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. and Certificate of Consent to Withdraw as Counsel (Coleman, Ronald)
February 28, 2022 Filing 51 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:21-cv-00727. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER OF TRANSFER. In light of the parties' stipulation #49 and "[f]or the convenience of parties and witnesses, in the interest of justice," 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the clerk is hereby directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 02/03/22. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
February 2, 2022 Filing 49 STIPULATION re #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
December 13, 2021 Filing 48 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. re #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District , #47 Notice (Other), Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (S.D. Tex. Decision), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (E. D. Pa. Decision))(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
November 11, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. re #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A: Eastern District of Louisiana Decision on Motion to Transfer)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
November 5, 2021 Filing 46 REPLY to Response to #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 22, 2021 Filing 45 Memorandum in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District filed by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Horn Baroody on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Baroody, Anne) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 20, 2021 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anne Horn Baroody to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6625499) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Baroody, Anne) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 joint motion for clarification. The defendants may file a responsive pleading or motion to dismiss on or before 14 days after the court's decision on the pending motion to transfer. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/18/21. (Codeanne, K.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 15, 2021 Filing 41 Consent MOTION for Clarification 40 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 39 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion,,, to Clarify the Court's October 12, 2021 Orders and to Extend Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Ronald) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #23 motion to dismiss without prejudice to refiling, if necessary, after the court's decision of the motion to transfer. In refiling the motion, the defendants may make reference to and rely on the arguments in the within motion. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/12/21. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #38 motion for extension of time to file a response/reply. To the extent the parties request that the court consider the pending motion to transfer prior to the motion to dismiss, the motion is granted. The current deadlines with respect to that motion shall remain in place 33 . To the extent the parties propose a future briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss, if necessary, the motion is denied. The court will deny the motion to dismiss without prejudice to refiling, if necessary, after the court's decision of the motion to transfer. Finally, the parties' motion for extension of the time within which they must file their 26(f) report is granted to and including 30 days after the court's decision on the motion to transfer and motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 10/12/21. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
October 11, 2021 Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 24, 2021 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT re 36 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Signed By Andrew P. Bleiman filed by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting the #35 motion for pro hac vice admission of Andrew P. Bleiman. Attorney Bleiman shall file, in full compliance with District of Connecticut Local R. of Civ. P. 83.1(d)(1)(b), an affidavit listing the corresponding bar identification number(s) for the bar memberships listed or, if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating it, on or before October 30, 2021. Attorney Bleiman shall file a certificate of good standing on or before November 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 9/22/2021. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 21, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney(s) Andrew P. Bleiman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6656703) by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 16, 2021 Filing 34 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss, responses due by 10/22/2021. #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District, responses due by 11/5/2021. (Alexander, R.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 motion for extension of time to file response/reply to and including 10/22/21 and 11/05/21, respectively. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/16/21. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 15, 2021 Filing 32 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss , #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District until 10/22/2021 by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 2, 2021 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT re 26 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,, Notice of Affidavit Signed By Bethany L. Appleby filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Anne Horn Baroody)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared C. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6625637) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Miller, Jared) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
September 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared C. Miller on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Miller, Jared) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER noting and so ordering the plaintiff's notice #20 of voluntary dismissal of its claims against the defendant, IHG Owners Association, Inc. The clerk shall dismiss this defendant from the case. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 08/30/21. (Covello, Alfred) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting the #22 motion for the pro hac vice admission of Attorney Jared C. Miller. Attorney Miller shall provide a certificate of good standing on or before 12/2/2019. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/30/2021. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #21 motion for pro hac vice admission of Attorney Anne Horn Baroody. Attorney Baroody shall file, in full accordance with the District of Connecticut Local R. of Civ. P. 83.1(d)(1)(b), an affidavit listing the corresponding bar identification number(s) for the bar memberships listed or, if no such numbers have been assigned, so stating it, on or before September 30, 2021. Attorney Baroody shall file a certificate of good standing on or before October 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/30/2021.(Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #23 MOTION to Dismiss , #24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District Signed By Jenny Tidwell filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jenny Tidwell, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E of Declaration of Jenny Tidwell)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer to Another District by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 27, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc..Responses due by 9/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jared C. Miller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6625637) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jared C. Miller)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Anne Horn Baroody to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6625499) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Anne Horn Baroody)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 26, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of IHG OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald T. Coleman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6610952) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Coleman, Ronald) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald T. Coleman, Jr on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Coleman, Ronald) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting the #15 motion for Attorney Ronald T. Coleman to be admitted pro hac vice. Attorney Coleman shall file a certificate of good standing on or before October 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/17/2021. (Sondergeld, C.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 13, 2021 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/15/2021. (Alexander, R.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 motion for extension of time to confer pursuant to local rule 26(f), to and including October 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 08/13/21. (Codeanne, K.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ronald T. Coleman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number BCTDC-6610952) by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Ronald T Coleman)(Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2021 or 14 days after a decision on planned motion to dismiss and/or or transfer Local Rule 26(f) Conference by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Answer deadline updated for Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC to 8/27/2021; IHG Owners Association, Inc. to 8/27/2021. (Alexander, R.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint, to and including August 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/02/21. (Codeanne, K.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 29, 2021 Filing 12 EXHIBIT by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC re #1 Complaint,. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2021 Respond/Move in Response to Complaint by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany L. Appleby on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Appleby, Bethany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
June 24, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC. Six Continents Hotels, Inc. served on 6/10/2021, answer due 7/1/2021. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Owners Association, Inc., Six Continents Hotels, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Justin E. Proper* *White & Williams LLP-PA* *1650 Market Street, One Liberty Place, Suite 1800* *Philadelphia, PA 19103*. (Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Aaron Hotel Group, LLC, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 5/27/2021.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 5/27/2021.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2021. Discovery due by 11/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2021. Signed by Clerk on 5/27/2021.(Bozek, M.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, IHG OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. d/b/a INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6524170.), filed by AARON HOTEL GROUP, LLC.(Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to HOLIDAY HOSPITALITY FRANCHISING, LLC, IHG OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC., SIX CONTINENTS HOTELS, INC. d/b/a INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP. (Proper, Justin) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]
May 27, 2021 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) [Transferred from Connecticut on 2/28/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aaron Hotel Group, LLC v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Hotel Group, LLC
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne Horn Baroody
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Bethany L. Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Jared C. Miller
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: Bethany L. Appleby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHG Owners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?