camLine USA Inc. v. Ocean Semiconductor LLC
Petitioner: camLine USA Inc.
Respondent: Ocean Semiconductor LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00860
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Christopher C Bly
Referring Judge: Steve C Jones
2 Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases, Lead Case Number 1:22-cv-910. The parties are DIRECTED to file all pleadings, briefs, and other materials in Case Number 1:22-cv-910-SCJ-JKL. The Court ORDERS the referenced cases CONSOLIDATED under Rule 42(a). The Clerk is DIRECTED to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE Case Numbers 1:22-cv-860-SCJ-JKL; 1:22-cv-870-SCJ-JKL; 1:22-cv-871-SCJ-JKL; 1:22-cv-872-SCJ-JKL; 1:22-cv-873-SCJ-JKL; 1:22-cv-874-SCJ-JKL; and 1:22-cv-911-SCJ-JKL. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 03/08/2022. (rsg)
March 8, 2022 Submission of #1 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ddm)
March 8, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III terminated from case. (rsg)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER transferring this case to District Judge Steve C. Jones and referring it to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins III. Judge Leigh Martin May, Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-CV-860-SCJ-JKL. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judges Leigh Martin May, Charles A. Pannell, Jr., Steve C. Jones, Mark H. Cohen, Michael L. Brown, Steven D. Grimberg, William M. Ray, II and Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 03/07/2022. (ddm) Modified on 3/8/2022 to edit docket text (ddm).
March 7, 2022 MOTIONS [1,5] referred. (ddm)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by camLine USA Inc.. (Crosby, L.)
March 1, 2022 Submission of #1 MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (adg)
March 1, 2022 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (adg)
March 1, 2022 Submission of #1 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (adg)
March 1, 2022 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:22-mi-13-LMM-CCB. (adg)
February 28, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Ocean Semiconductor LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Peter Mazur, #2 Exhibit A - 2022-02-14 Response to Subpoena - Ocean v. NXP - CamLine, #3 Exhibit B - camLine company profile, #4 Exhibit C - www.camline.com Contact page, #5 Exhibit D - Andrew Lu LinkedIn profile page, #6 Exhibit E - Samuel Borsutzky LinkedIn profile page, #7 Exhibit F - 2022-01-24 NXP Resp. to Ocean 1st RFPs (Nos. 1-44))(Kent, Daniel)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Arthur Kent on behalf of Ocean Semiconductor LLC (Kent, Daniel)
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER: Respondent is directed to respond to the motion for a protective order and to quash, (Doc. 1), by February 28, 2022. The Clerk is DIRECTED to serve this order on counsel listed on the certificate of service, by both email and regular mail, as identified on Doc. 1 at 4. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 2/23/2022. (jtj)
February 23, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Ocean Semiconductor LLC, camLine USA Inc. re 2 Minute Order. (jtj)
February 16, 2022 Submission of #1 MOTION for Protective Order; and MOTION to Quash Subpoena on Non-Party camLine USA Inc., to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop)
February 14, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Protective Order; and MOTION to Quash Subpoena on Non-Party camLine USA Inc. with Brief In Support by camLine USA Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -A -Subpoena, #3 Exhibit -B -Complaint, #4 Exhibit -C -Huawei Complaint, #5 Exhibit -D -NVIDIA Complaint, #6 Exhibit -E -Renesas Complaint, #7 Exhibit -F -Silicon Complaint, #8 Exhibit -G -STMicro Complaint, #9 Exhibit -H -Declaration of Andrew Lu, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
February 14, 2022 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11592050 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: camLine USA Inc. v. Ocean Semiconductor LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ocean Semiconductor LLC
Represented By: Daniel Arthur Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: camLine USA Inc.
Represented By: Elexa Elpis Diktas
Represented By: L. Clint Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?