Sajjad v. Mayorkas et al
Petitioner: Syed Muhammad Sajjad
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Jaddou and Shineka Miller
Case Number: 1:2022cv00954
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1447 Hearings on Denial of Application for Naturalization
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Syed Muhammad Sajjad. Shineka Miller served on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. (Claffey, Danielle)
March 28, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Syed Muhammad Sajjad. Ur Jaddou served on 3/23/2022, answer due 5/23/2022 ; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022. (Claffey, Danielle) Modified on 3/29/2022 to edit text (cavc).
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Claffey, Danielle)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE AMY TOTENBERG. You are required to sign and file a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached hereto. To request to file material under seal, the Parties should follow the mechanism described in Section II(J) of Appendix H to the Courts Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/15/2022. (jra)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kurt Erskine. (eop)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland. (eop)
March 8, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shineka Miller. (eop)
March 8, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur Jaddou. (eop)
March 8, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (eop)
March 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Syed Muhammad Sajjad. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11639556) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -N-400 Receipt Notice, #2 Exhibit -B -First Interview Notice, #3 Exhibit -C -First De-schedule Notice, #4 Exhibit -D -Second Cancellation Notice, #5 Exhibit -E -USCIS Change of Address Confirmations, #6 Exhibit -F -Third Interview Notice, #7 Exhibit -G -Naturalization Interview Results, #8 Exhibit -H -Congressional Inquiries, #9 Exhibit -I -USCIS Case Status, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 3/9/2022 (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sajjad v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Syed Muhammad Sajjad
Represented By: Danielle M. Claffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shineka Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?