Barone-Vecchiarelli v. International Business Machines Corp.
Plaintiff: Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01139
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010 Application to Vacate Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Compliance by International Business Machines Corp. (Corley, Patrick)
May 3, 2022 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Persons by International Business Machines Corp.. (Corley, Patrick)
May 3, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick McNary Corley on behalf of International Business Machines Corp. (Corley, Patrick)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #3 #9 Motions for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/28/22. (bnw)
April 27, 2022 Submission of #3 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal, #9 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (hfm)
April 14, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Radford, James)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 4/13/22. (bnw)
April 11, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. International Business Machines Corp. waiver mailed on 4/11/2022, answer due 6/10/2022. (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
April 8, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Compliance to the Standing Order in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg (Pagano, Adelaide)
April 8, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance to the Standing Order in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg (Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
April 8, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #8 Notice of Filing, Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
April 8, 2022 Filing 8 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli re #1 Petition for Arbitration, (Attachments: #1 Brief Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Supplement Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #6 and #7 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Entered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 3/30/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
March 29, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Adelaide Pagano Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Adelaide Pagano added appearing on behalf of Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli (gas)
March 29, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Shannon Liss-Riordan Pro Hac Vice.. Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan added appearing on behalf of Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli (gas)
March 25, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Adelaide Pagano Pro Hac Vice.by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (Radford, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 25, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Shannon Liss-Riordan Pro Hac Vice.by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (Radford, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 24, 2022 RETURN of #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Adelaide Pagano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11676333). to attorney for correction re: residential address. (nmb)
March 24, 2022 RETURN of #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Shannon Liss-Riordan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11676372). to attorney for correction re: residential address and incorrect local counsel address. (nmb)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Shannon Liss-Riordan Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11676372).by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (Radford, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Adelaide Pagano Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11676333).by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (Radford, James) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal Documents, titled, Motion to Provisionally Seal Documents, by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (eop) Modified text on 3/22/2022 (eop).
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corp.. (eop)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to Vacate Arbitration Award filed by Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11672662) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Provisionally Filed Under Seal), #2 Supplement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barone-Vecchiarelli v. International Business Machines Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Barone-Vecchiarelli
Represented By: James E. Radford
Represented By: Adelaide Pagano
Represented By: Shannon Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corp.
Represented By: Patrick McNary Corley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?