ADMI, Inc. v. Surterra Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: ADMI, Inc.
Defendant: Surterra Holdings, Inc. doing business as Parallel Brands
Case Number: 1:2022cv01202
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 4 Petition to order arbitration; failure to arbitrate
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Submission of #6 MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order DOCKET ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time re #9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply to ADMI's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. The parties are reminded that any future joint/consent motions must be accompanied by a proposed order. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/23/2022. (pdw)
May 20, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time File Reply to ADMI's Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Surterra Holdings, Inc.. (Strickland, Vernon)
May 19, 2022 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Surterra Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Strickland, Vernon)
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ADMI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Beck, Philip)
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Surterra Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Strickland, Vernon)
April 20, 2022 Filing 5 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action , as to Surterra Holdings, Inc., d/b/a/ Parallel Brands. (Beck, Philip)
March 25, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Surterra Holdings, Inc.. (eop)
March 25, 2022 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons by ADMI, Inc.. (eop)
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Arbitration Award filed by ADMI, Inc.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11686855) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Exhibit -C, #4 Exhibit -D, #5 Exhibit -E, #6 Exhibit -F, #7 Exhibit -G, #8 Exhibit -H, #9 Exhibit -I, #10 Exhibit -J, #11 Exhibit -K, #12 Exhibit -L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADMI, Inc. v. Surterra Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADMI, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Edward Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surterra Holdings, Inc. doing business as Parallel Brands
Represented By: Vernon M. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?