Hunter v. Governor of the State of Georgia et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr.
Defendant: Governor of the State of Georgia, United States Pentagon and Veteran Office of Administration
Case Number: 1:2022cv01325
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (dmb)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER dismissing case without prejudice for Hunter's failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's order that he file a properly amended complaint. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/29/2022. (dmb)
April 29, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr. re #5 Order, #6 Clerk's Judgment. (dmb)
April 29, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 21 days that identifies the legal basis for his claim, facts supporting it, and a prayer for relief. Failure to do so will constitute a violation of a lawful court order resulting in dismissal under Local Rule 43.1 and failure to state a claim under 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/7/2022. (dmb)
April 7, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr. re #4 Order,, Set Submission Deadline,. (dmb)
April 6, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit the Complaint to the District Judge for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 4/6/2022. (dmb)
April 6, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr. re #2 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (dmb)
April 6, 2022 Submission of #3 Complaint for frivolity review to District Judge Timothy C. Batten Sr. (dmb)
April 5, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Petition/ Request, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Governor of the State of Georgia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Eugene Hunter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of the State of Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Pentagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veteran Office of Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?