Fasan et al v. Mayorkas et al
Plaintiff: Oluwaseun Fasan and Kyaira S. Ancrum
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Shineka Miller
Case Number: 1:2022cv01388
Filed: April 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Referring Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- ORDER Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/6/2022. (tmf) Modified on 6/6/2022 to edit security and add red text (tmf).
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Notification of Docket Correction re #6 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR--- ORDER Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 6/6/2022. (tmf) Modified on 6/6/2022 to edit security and add red text (tmf).
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/4/2022. (sap)
April 18, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. Judge William M. Ray, II no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-CV-1388-SEG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (rlh)
April 13, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Oluwaseun Fasan, Kyaira S. Ancrum. All Defendants. (Fogle, H.)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/12/22. (jkl)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alejandro Mayorkas. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Kurt Erskine, #2 Summons as to Merrick B. Garland, #3 Summons as to UR Mendoza Jaddou, #4 Summons as to Shineka Miller)(kxm)
April 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Mandamus Relief filed by Oluwaseun Fasan, Kyaira S. Ancrum. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11718941) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fasan et al v. Mayorkas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oluwaseun Fasan
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyaira S. Ancrum
Represented By: H. Glenn Fogle, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shineka Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?