Weems Industries, Inc. v. Teknor Apex Company
Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Teknor Apex Company
Petitioner: Swan Products LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv01399
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Timothy C Batten
Referring Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
2 Judge: Catherine M Salinas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Non-Party Swan Products LLCs #1 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 05/16/2022. (rsg)
May 2, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE: A Zoom videoconference hearing has been scheduled for May 12, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. to address the pending motion to quash. Log-in instructions have been sent via email. (drg)
April 20, 2022 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Swan Products LLC. (Knoop, Matthew)
April 18, 2022 Case Reassigned to Judge Sarah E. Geraghty. Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-01399-SEG-CMS. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dmb)
April 11, 2022 Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:22-mi-00025-TCB-CMS. (adg)
April 11, 2022 Submission of #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, #3 Order,to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (adg)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Amabile on behalf of Weems Industries, Inc. (Amabile, John)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by Weems Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registration Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - Petition for Cancellation by Apex, #3 Exhibit C - Petition for Cancellation by Swan, #4 Exhibit D - Apex Website Company Information, #5 Exhibit E - Weems First Request for Production of Documents, Request no. 48, #6 Exhibit F - Apexs Response to Requests for Production, Request no. 48, #7 Exhibit G - Communication re Updated Withheld Document Index, #8 Exhibit H - Excerpt, Transcript December 10, 2021 Meet and Confer Conference, #9 Exhibit I - Excerpt, Transcript January 27, 2022 Meet and Confer Conference)(Amabile, John)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Proof of Service by Swan Products LLC re #3 Order. (Knoop, Matthew) Text modified on 3/30/2022 (adg).
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena: Counsel for Swan Products LLC is hereby ORDERED to serve a copy of its Motion to Quash Subpoena, and related documents, including its notice of filing, Exhibit A, and a copy of this Order, upon Plaintiff and Defendant in the underlying Iowa action within 7 DAYS of the date of this order. Counsel for Swan Products LLC is further ORDERED to file a proof of service with this Court. Responses to the Motion to Quash Subpoena, if any, should be filed with this Court on or before 4/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 3/23/2022. (adg)
March 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit A by Swan Products LLC re #1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knoop, Matthew) Text modified on 3/23/2022 (adg).
March 22, 2022 Submission of #1 NON-PARTY'S MOTION to Quash Subpoena, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (eop)
March 18, 2022 Filing 1 NON-PARTY'S MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Swan Products LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop)
March 18, 2022 Filing Fee Paid: $ 49.00, receipt number AGANDC-11669230 (eop)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weems Industries, Inc. v. Teknor Apex Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weems Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Amabile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teknor Apex Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Swan Products LLC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Knoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?