Sulley v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Petitioner: Abass Y. Sulley
Respondent: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Mendoza Jaddou and Shineka C. Miller
Case Number: 1:2022cv01416
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1421 c Review of Denial of Application for Naturalization
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Abass Y. Sulley. Shineka C. Miller served on 4/20/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Polanco, Carlos)
April 23, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Abass Y. Sulley. Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Polanco, Carlos)
April 23, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Abass Y. Sulley. Alejandro Mayorkas served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Polanco, Carlos)
April 23, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Abass Y. Sulley. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) served on 4/19/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Polanco, Carlos)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
April 13, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Shineka C. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Mayorkas, #2 Miller)(jpa)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Abass Y. Sulley for Shineka Miller as Field Office Director of USCIS Atlanta (Polanco, Carlos)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Abass Y. Sulley for Ur Mendoza Jaddou as USCIS Director (Polanco, Carlos)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Abass Y. Sulley for Alejandro Mayorkas as DHS Secretary (Polanco, Carlos)
April 11, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). (eop)
April 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Abass Y. Sulley. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11723909) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sulley v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Abass Y. Sulley
Represented By: Carlos M. Polanco, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alejandro Mayorkas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Shineka C. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?