Barlan Holdings, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Barlan Holdings, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv01487
Filed: April 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William M Ray
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7609 IRS: Petition to Quash IRS Summons
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition, correcting at #23 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 6/14/2022. (tas)
June 14, 2022 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER Corrected Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Petition re: #22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition . (DeCinque, Anthony)
June 14, 2022 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petition by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 ---DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR---)(DeCinque, Anthony) Modified on 6/14/2022 per attorney phone call (ane).
May 9, 2022 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Barlan Holdings, LLC. United States of America served on 4/27/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. (Levin, Michelle)
May 9, 2022 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Levin, Michelle)
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Levin, Michelle)
May 9, 2022 Filing 18 Return of Service Executed by Barlan Holdings, LLC. United States of America served on 4/25/2022, answer due 6/24/2022. (Levin, Michelle)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/5/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/5/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas)
May 6, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #17 Order on Application for Admission PHV, to Sarah E. Green. (tas)
May 5, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle Abroms Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758375).. Attorney Michelle A. Levin added appearing on behalf of Barlan Holdings, LLC (gas)
May 5, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah E. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758424).. Attorney Sarah E. Green added appearing on behalf of Barlan Holdings, LLC (gas)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/29/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/29/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/29/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tas)
April 28, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Barlan Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Legacy Land Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate TC Investors, LLC, a Missouri Limited Liability Company, Other Affiliate The Miles 2018 Irrevocable Trust, Other Affiliate The Adams 2018 Irrevocable Trust for Barlan Holdings, LLC by Barlan Holdings, LLC.(Garroway, Nathan)
April 28, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory P. Rhodes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758400). Attorney Gregory P. Rhodes added appearing on behalf of Barlan Holdings, LLC (cdg)
April 28, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Logan C. Abernathy Pro Hac Vice Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758409). Attorney Logan C. Abernathy added appearing on behalf of Barlan Holdings, LLC (cdg)
April 28, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Sidney W. Jackson, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758388). Attorney Sidney W. Jackson, IV added appearing on behalf of Barlan Holdings, LLC (cdg)
April 26, 2022 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah E. Green Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758424).by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Garroway, Nathan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Logan C. Abernathy Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758409).by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Garroway, Nathan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Gregory P. Rhodes Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758400).by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Garroway, Nathan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 26, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Sidney W. Jackson, IV Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758388).by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Garroway, Nathan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 26, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Michelle Abroms Levin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11758375).by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Garroway, Nathan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
April 21, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED Petition to Quash IRS Summonses, Examine IRS Agent Lijia Wu, or Narrow the Scope of IRS Summonses against Barlan Holdings, LLC filed by Barlan Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Dana Meagrow))(Garroway, Nathan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 4/22/2022 to edit docket text(tas).
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lijia Wu. (eop)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kurt Erskine. (eop)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Merrick Garland. (eop)
April 19, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States of America. (eop)
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION to Quash IRS Summonses, Examine IRS Agent Lijia Wu, or Narrow the Scope of IRS Summonses filed by Barlan Holdings, LLC.. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11740715) (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit -A -Summons issued to Adams, Miles, Barlan Properties, Premier Cla, #3 Exhibit -B -Summons to Barlan Holdings 3/2922, #4 Exhibit -C -NAP issued to adams as Barlan Holdings Partnership Rep., #5 Exhibit -D -Two Info. Doc Requests (IDR), #6 Exhibit -E -5/25/21 Fax from Conusel for Barlan Holdings to Agent Wu with PO, #7 Exhibit -F -5/26/21 Fax from Counsel to Agent Wu, #8 Exhibit -G -5/26/21 Fax from Agent Wu, #9 Exhibit -H -Fax from Counsel to Agent Wu -Compliance Failure with IRM, #10 Exhibit -I- 6/2/21 Fax from Agent Wu to Counsel stating issue for Exam as, #11 Exhibit -J -6/24/21 Barlan Holdingss Response to IDR-2, #12 Exhibit -K -6/24/21 BArlan Holdings Response to IDR-2, #13 Exhibit -L -6/25/21 Fax from Counsel to Agent Wu agreeing to 6/25/21 Opening Co, #14 Exhibit -M -6/23/21 Fax from Agent Wu to Counsel enclosing Opening Conference Ag, #15 Exhibit -N- 6/24/21 Exam Plan for Agent Wu, #16 Exhibit -O -Signed Exam Plan 6/28/21, #17 Exhibit -P -6/28/21 Letter Requesting Clarification in Exam Plan to Agent Wu, #18 Exhibit -Q -6/28/21 Fax Declining to Extend Statue of Limitation on Assessment, #19 Exhibit -R -7/29/21 Fax from Agent Wu to Counsel IDR-4, #20 Exhibit -S - 9/13/21 Fax from Agent Wu to Counsel re: Barlan Holdings Extend, #21 Exhibit -T -Letter 9/28/21 Declining to Extend Sttue of Limitation from Counsel, #22 Exhibit -U -9/1/21 Summons to Renasant Bank, #23 Exhibit -V -Barlan Holdings, LLC's Response to IDR-4, #24 Exhibit -W -3/10/22 Summons issued to Dwyer Law Offices, LLC in Barlan Properties, #25 Exhibit -X -Summons issued to S. Miles, Premier Clay Investors and Edmondson S, #26 Exhibit -Y -Letter from Counsel to Terry Marsh dated 3/23/22, #27 Exhibit -Z -3/30/22 Letter to Counsel to T. Marsh and Maria Podell)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/20/2022: #28 Exhibit -A -4/1/22 Letter from T. Marsh to Counsel, #29 Exhibit -B -4/4/22 Letter from Counsel to T. Marsh, #30 Exhibit -CC -Agenda for Call re: Barlan Properties and Holdings, #31 Exhibit -DD -Declaration of S. Miles, #32 Exhibit -EE -Declaration of A. Adams, #33 Exhibit -FF -IRS Directive LB&I 04-0214-004, #34 Affidavit - Declaration of L. Abernathy, #35 Civil Cover Sheet) (eop).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barlan Holdings, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barlan Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nathan Lewis Garroway
Represented By: Gregory P. Rhodes
Represented By: Logan C. Abernathy
Represented By: Michelle Abroms Levin
Represented By: Sarah E. Green
Represented By: Sidney W. Jackson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Anthony Christopher DeCinque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?