Thomas v. City of Atlanta et al
Plaintiff: Spencer Thomas
Defendant: City of Atlanta, Erika Shields, Rodney Bryant, V. Rodriguez and V. Hobbs
Case Number: 1:2022cv01527
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Submission of #7 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
May 18, 2022 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint with Brief In Support by Spencer Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Rucker, Ryan)
May 18, 2022 Submission of #5 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (lme)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 4/28/2022. (tmf)
April 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by City of Atlanta. (Foster, Joshua)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint by City of Atlanta. Discovery ends on 9/26/2022.(Foster, Joshua) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
April 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE by City of Atlanta re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet (Foster, Joshua)
April 20, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rodney Bryant, City of Atlanta, V. Hobbs, V. Rodriguez and Erika Shields filed by Spencer Thomas. (Filed 11/18/21 in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by City of Atlanta. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AGANDC-11746286) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A thru D)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. City of Atlanta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spencer Thomas
Represented By: Ryan Arthur Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Atlanta
Represented By: Alisha Marie S. Nair
Represented By: Joshua Stanley Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?