Taylor v. Mystery Ship, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gail Taylor
Defendant: Mystery Ship, LLC, Myra Nix, Andrea Johns and Trina Marie Hill
Case Number: 1:2022cv01617
Filed: April 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gail Taylor. Mystery Ship, LLC waiver mailed on 6/9/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Trachian-Bradley, Mary)
June 9, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gail Taylor. Trina Marie Hill waiver mailed on 6/9/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Trachian-Bradley, Mary)
June 9, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gail Taylor. Myra Nix waiver mailed on 6/9/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Trachian-Bradley, Mary)
June 9, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gail Taylor. Andrea Johns waiver mailed on 6/9/2022, answer due 8/8/2022. (Trachian-Bradley, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mystery Ship, LLC. (kxm)
May 27, 2022 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Gail Taylor (Trachian-Bradley, Mary)
April 29, 2022 Filing 8 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (kxm)
April 28, 2022 Filing 7 PROPOSED AO 121 . (Trachian-Bradley, Mary)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 4/26/2022. (anc)
April 26, 2022 Notice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop)
April 25, 2022 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Trina Marie Hill. (eop)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrea Johns. (eop)
April 25, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Myra Nix. (eop)
April 25, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mystery Ship, LLC. (eop)
April 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gail Taylor. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11752968) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Mystery Ship, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Taylor
Represented By: Byron M. G. Sanford
Represented By: Mary Turvanda Trachian-Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mystery Ship, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myra Nix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trina Marie Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?