McHugh et al v. Sykes et al
Plaintiff: Kyle McHugh and Larry Meek
Defendant: Ollin Sykes, Scotty Sykes, Sykes & Company, P.A., Ernest NeSmith, Marcus Rogers, NeSmith Rogers, Financial Consulting Group, LLC, Robert D. Keller, Joseph Skalski, Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Nancy Zak, Lisa Cantrell, Josh Stanley, Forever Forests, LLC, Green Earth Reserve, LLC, Terry Heath, Fieldstone South, LLC, Dennis W. Benson, Benson Appraisal Services, Douglas Ross Kenny, Rick A. Kenny, Kenny & Associates, Inc., Dolph Winders, Fisherbroyles Legal Counsel, Fisherbroyles, LLC, Skalski Law Firm, LLC, Kimberly A. Skalski, Skalski CPAS, LLC, Lamb & Braswell, LLC, Arthur J. Goolsby, Jr. and Blair K. Cleveland
Case Number: 1:2022cv01685
Filed: April 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Geraghty
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 5/4/2022. (sap)
May 4, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Blair K. Cleveland, Arthur J. Goolsby, Jr., Terry Heath. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cavc)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kyle McHugh, Larry Meek Summons of Blair K. Cleveland (Jennings, Kathleen)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kyle McHugh, Larry Meek Summons of Arthur J. Goolsby, Jr. (Jennings, Kathleen)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Kyle McHugh, Larry Meek Summons of T.J. Heath (Jennings, Kathleen)
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc., Dennis W. Benson, Benson Appraisal Services, Lisa Cantrell, Fieldstone South, LLC, Fisherbroyles Legal Counsel, Fisherbroyles, LLC, Forever Forests, LLC, Green Earth Reserve, LLC, Terry Heath, Robert D. Keller, Douglas Ross Kenny, Rick A. Kenny, Kenny & Associates, Inc., Lamb & Braswell, LLC, Ernest NeSmith, NeSmith Rogers, Financial Consulting Group, LLC, Marcus Rogers, Joseph Skalski, Kimberly A. Skalski, Skalski CPAS, LLC, Skalski Law Firm, LLC, Josh Stanley, Ollin Sykes, Scotty Sykes, Sykes & Company, P.A., Dolph Winders, Nancy Zak. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons)(tas)
April 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Kyle McHugh, Larry Meek. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11766898) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McHugh et al v. Sykes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle McHugh
Represented By: James W. Wimberly, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen J Jennings
Represented By: Daniel J. Treuden
Represented By: Korry D. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick T. Kane
Represented By: Robert G. Bernhoft
Represented By: James Larry Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Meek
Represented By: James W. Wimberly, Jr.
Represented By: Kathleen J Jennings
Represented By: Daniel J. Treuden
Represented By: Korry D. Lewis
Represented By: Patrick T. Kane
Represented By: Robert G. Bernhoft
Represented By: James Larry Stine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ollin Sykes
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotty Sykes
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sykes & Company, P.A.
Represented By: Dana Kristin Maine
Represented By: Travis Martin Cashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest NeSmith
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Reilly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Rogers
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Reilly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NeSmith Rogers, Financial Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Reilly, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Keller
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Rollins
Represented By: Gregory Keith Smith
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Skalski
Represented By: Andrew Mabon Beal
Represented By: Milinda Lynn Brown
Represented By: Paul Jay Pontrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Coast Conservancy, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Rollins
Represented By: Gregory Keith Smith
Represented By: Jason S. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Zak
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Cantrell
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Stanley
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forever Forests, LLC
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Earth Reserve, LLC
Represented By: Eric S. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Heath
Represented By: Duke R. Groover
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fieldstone South, LLC
Represented By: Duke R. Groover
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis W. Benson
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: Donald Brown
Represented By: Steven G. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benson Appraisal Services
Represented By: William Dowdy White
Represented By: Donald Brown
Represented By: Steven G. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Ross Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick A. Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolph Winders
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Hoffmeyer
Represented By: Johannes Stuart Kingma
Represented By: Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisherbroyles Legal Counsel
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Hoffmeyer
Represented By: Johannes Stuart Kingma
Represented By: Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisherbroyles, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Charles Hoffmeyer
Represented By: Johannes Stuart Kingma
Represented By: Shannon McKenzie Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skalski Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Mabon Beal
Represented By: Milinda Lynn Brown
Represented By: Paul Jay Pontrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A. Skalski
Represented By: Andrew Mabon Beal
Represented By: Milinda Lynn Brown
Represented By: Paul Jay Pontrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skalski CPAS, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Mabon Beal
Represented By: Milinda Lynn Brown
Represented By: Paul Jay Pontrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamb & Braswell, LLC
Represented By: Adam Scott Rubenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Goolsby, Jr.
Represented By: Dustin R. Marlowe
Represented By: Jeffery Spence Johnson
Represented By: Kerry Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair K. Cleveland
Represented By: Dustin R. Marlowe
Represented By: Jeffery Spence Johnson
Represented By: Kerry Fontana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?