Stross v. American Chinese Media L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Defendant: American Chinese Media L.L.C. and American Chinese Life L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2022cv01714
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Clerks Entry of Default as to American Chinese Media L.L.C. (lwb)
June 14, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Evan Andersen, #2 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Andersen, Evan)
June 14, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Alexander Bayonne Stross re #7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default of Striking Docket Entry 7 (Andersen, Evan)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 --- DOCUMENT REFILED AT DOC ENTRY 9 --- MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 A - Declaration of Service)(Andersen, Evan) Modified on 6/16/2022 (lwb).
June 1, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. American Chinese Media L.L.C. served on 5/18/2022, answer due 6/8/2022. (Andersen, Evan)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORETHE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on May 9, 2022. (lwb)
May 2, 2022 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Chinese Media L.L.C.. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11769860) filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Works, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificates, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement, #4 Exhibit 4 - Demand Letters, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. American Chinese Media L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Chinese Media L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Chinese Life L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Represented By: Evan A. Andersen
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?