Vote.org et al v. Georgia State Election Board et al
Plaintiff: Vote.org, Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans and Priorities USA
Defendant: Georgia State Election Board, Edward Lindsey, Janice W. Johnston, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Matthew Mashburn, Cathy Woolard, Kathleen D. Ruth, Aaron V. Johnson, Mark Wingate and Teresa K. Crawford
Intervenor Defendant: Georgia Republican Party Inc. and Republican National Committee
Case Number: 1:2022cv01734
Filed: May 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): February 7, 2023, February 16-24, 2023, April 3-10, 2023, May 18-20, 2023, by Adam Martin Sparks. (Sparks, Adam)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/24/2022, before Judge JP BOULEE. Court Reporter/Transcriber PENNY COUDRIET. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/30/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing) (ppc)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #53 APPLICATION for Admission of Harmeet K. Dhillon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12016857).. Attorney Harmeet Dhillon added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party Inc. (kkh)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting f Harmeet K. Dhillon's #53 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/29/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER approving #40 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan, except as herein modified. Per the request of the parties, this case is assigned to an eight-month discovery tract. Discovery will not open until the Court issues its ruling on State Defendants Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/26/2022. (nmb)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Noah B. Baron's #52 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 08/25/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Boulee: Status Conference held on 8/24/2022. The rules of discovery will be STAYEDpending resolution of the motion to dismiss. (Court Reporter Penny Coudriet)(nmb)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #51 APPLICATION for Admission of Spencer W. Klein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12009467).. Attorney Spencer Klein added appearing on behalf of Vote.org (kkh)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #52 APPLICATION for Admission of Noah B. Baron Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12009531).. Attorney Noah B. Baron added appearing on behalf of Vote.org (kkh)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting Spencer W. Klein's #51 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/24/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 APPLICATION for Admission of Harmeet K. Dhillon Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12016857).by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF VIDEO PROCEEDING : Status Conference set for 8/24/2022 at 03:45 PM before Judge J. P. Boulee. Connection Instructions: https://ganduscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1618097733 Meeting ID: 161 809 7733 Passcode: 1908 Audio via phone: +1 551 285 1373. You must follow the instructions of the Court for remote proceedings available #here. The procedure for filing documentary exhibits admitted during the proceeding is available #here. Photographing, recording, or broadcasting of any judicial proceedings, including proceedings held by video teleconferencing or telephone conferencing, is strictly and absolutely prohibited. (jkl)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 APPLICATION for Admission of Noah B. Baron Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12009531).by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION for Admission of Spencer W. Klein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12009467).by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Spencer Klein. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Noah B. Baron. Clerk to follow-up by 8/29/2022. (cdg)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting David Warrington's #47 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice. So ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/16/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jkl)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #47 APPLICATION for Admission of David Warrington Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11991266). Attorney David Warrington added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee (cdg)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Intervenor-Defendants ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee.(Carver, William) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 8/12/2022 to correct capitalization (nmb).
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 APPLICATION for Admission of David Warrington Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11991266).by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Certificate of Interested Persons by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #36 MOTION to Dismiss, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Schaerr, Gene)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #44 Application for Admission of Gary Lawkowski Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 8/10/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #44 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary Lawkowski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11981870).. Attorney Gary Lawkowski added appearing on behalf of Georgia Republican Party Inc. (kkh)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 APPLICATION for Admission of Gary Lawkowski Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11981870).by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee. (Carver, William) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org.(Sparks, Adam)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for State Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn.(Tyson, Bryan)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 First Initial Disclosures by Teresa K. Crawford, Aaron V. Johnson, Kathleen D. Ruth, Mark Wingate, Cathy Woolard.(Lowman, David)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #35 Motion to Intervene. IT IS ORDERED that Movants are entitled to intervene in this matter. Movants shall file their answer no later than August 10, 2022. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on August 3, 2022. (lwb)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #35 Amended MOTION to Intervene, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Brief by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Corrected Brief, #2 Exhibit 2-Redlined Brief)(Nkwonta, Uzoma)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Nkwonta, Uzoma)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #33 Application for Admission of Joshua James Prince Pro Hac Vice and #34 Application for Admission of Cristina Martinez Squiers Pro Hac Vice are hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/15/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #33 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua James Prince Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11915100).. Attorney Joshua J. Prince added appearing on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (gas)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #32 Application for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/14/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #34 APPLICATION for Admission of Cristina Martinez Squiers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11915107).. Attorney Cristina Martinez Squiers added appearing on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (gas)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A:Absentee Ballot Signature Requirements by State)(Schaerr, Gene)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #32 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11915096). Attorney H. Christopher Bartolomucci added appearing on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (cdg)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Amended MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support of Their Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] INTERVENOR-DEFENDANTS [PROPOSED] ANSWER)(Carver, William)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Submission of #29 MOTION to Intervene, to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ceo)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: In light of the amended motion filed by the Georgia Republican Party and the Republican National Committee, the Motion to Intervene #29 is DENIED as moot. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/12/22. (ceo)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 APPLICATION for Admission of Cristina Martinez Squiers Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11915107).by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 APPLICATION for Admission of Joshua James Prince Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11915100).by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION for Admission of H. Christopher Bartolomucci Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11915096).by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Teresa K. Crawford, Aaron V. Johnson, Kathleen D. Ruth, Mark Wingate, Cathy Woolard. Discovery ends on 12/2/2022.(Lowman, David) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Georgia State Election Board answer due 7/13/2022; Sara Tindall Ghazal answer due 7/13/2022; Janice W. Johnston answer due 7/13/2022; Edward Lindsey answer due 7/13/2022; Matthew Mashburn answer due 7/13/2022. (ceo)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: For good cause shown, State Defendants' Unopposed Motion #30 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that State Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is extended through and including July 13, 2022. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 6/29/22. (ceo)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint re: #1 Complaint, by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Intervene with Brief In Support by Georgia Republican Party Inc., Republican National Committee. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law In Support of Their Motion to Intervene)(Carver, William)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/13/22 - 6/24/22; 6/27/22 - 7/1/22; 7/5/22 - 7/15/22, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 3, 2022, June 15-17, 2022, July 5-6, 2022, July 18-22, 2022, September 15-19, 2022, September 30, 2022, October 11-14, 2022, by Adam Martin Sparks. (Sparks, Adam)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #26 Application for Admission of Marcos Mocine-McQueen Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/13/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #26 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcos Mocine-McQueen Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Marcos Mocine-McQueen added appearing on behalf of Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org (cdg)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcos Mocine-McQueen Pro Hac Vice.by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #16 Application for Admission of Alexander F. Atkins Pro Hac Vice and #18 Application for Admission of Uzoma N. Nkwonta Pro Hac Vice are hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/11/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney Alexander Atkins re Order on #16 Application for Admission PHV. (ceo)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander F. Atkins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11780594).. Attorney Alexander F. Atkins added appearing on behalf of Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org (nmb)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #18 APPLICATION for Admission of Uzoma N. Nkwonta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11780645).. Attorney Uzoma Nkwonta added appearing on behalf of Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org (nmb)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order RETURN of #17 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcos Mocine-McQueen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11780631). to attorney for correction re: Please specify courts which admitted (highest state court or federal court). (nmb)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11779264).. Attorney Gene C. Schaerr added appearing on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (gas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian J Field Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11779282).. Attorney Brian Field added appearing on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (gas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #15 Application for Admission of Brian J Field Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/9/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER {by Docket Entry Only}: The #14 Application for Admission of Gene C Schaerr Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. Ordered by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/9/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(ceo)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Festin LaRoss on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (LaRoss, Diane)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Loree Anne Paradise on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Paradise, Loree Anne)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas C. Rawlings on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Rawlings, Thomas)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Tobias C. Tatum, Sr on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Tatum, Tobias)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah Ann Ausburn on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Ausburn, Deborah)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel H Weigel on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Weigel, Daniel)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Jacoutot, Bryan)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 APPLICATION for Admission of Uzoma N. Nkwonta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11780645).by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 APPLICATION for Admission of Marcos Mocine-McQueen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11780631).by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Alexander F. Atkins Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number BGANDC-11780594).by Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans, Priorities USA, Vote.org. (Sparks, Adam) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Brian J Field Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11779282).by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Gene C Schaerr Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11779264).by Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn. (Tyson, Bryan) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Georgia State Election Board, Sara Tindall Ghazal, Janice W. Johnston, Edward Lindsey, Matthew Mashburn (Tyson, Bryan)
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/3/22. (ceo)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Teresa K. Crawford. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Mark Wingate. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Aaron V. Johnson. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kathleen D. Ruth. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Electronic Summons Issued as to Cathy Woolard. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Matthew Mashburn. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Sara Tindall Ghazal. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Janice W. Johnston. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Edward Lindsey. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Georgia State Election Board. (abm)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief filed by Priorities USA, Vote.org, Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11772197) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(abm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vote.org et al v. Georgia State Election Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vote.org
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jamil A Favors
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Alexander F. Atkins
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Represented By: Noah B. Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Alliance for Retired Americans
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jamil A Favors
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Alexander F. Atkins
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Represented By: Noah B. Baron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priorities USA
Represented By: Adam Martin Sparks
Represented By: Jamil A Favors
Represented By: Michael Brandon Jones
Represented By: Alexander F. Atkins
Represented By: Marcos Mocine-McQueen
Represented By: Uzoma Nkwonta
Represented By: Noah B. Baron
Represented By: Spencer W. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia State Election Board
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Thomas C. Rawlings
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Cristina Martinez Squiers
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Joshua J. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lindsey
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Thomas C. Rawlings
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Cristina Martinez Squiers
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Joshua J. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice W. Johnston
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Thomas C. Rawlings
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Joshua J. Prince
Represented By: Cristina Martinez Squiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Tindall Ghazal
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Thomas C. Rawlings
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Cristina Martinez Squiers
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Represented By: Joshua J. Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mashburn
Represented By: Bryan P. Tyson
Represented By: Brian Field
Represented By: Gene C. Schaerr
Represented By: Bryan Francis Jacoutot
Represented By: Daniel H Weigel
Represented By: Deborah Ann Ausburn
Represented By: Diane Festin LaRoss
Represented By: Loree Anne Paradise
Represented By: Thomas C. Rawlings
Represented By: Tobias C. Tatum, Sr
Represented By: Cristina Martinez Squiers
Represented By: Joshua J. Prince
Represented By: H. Christopher Bartolomucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Woolard
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen D. Ruth
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron V. Johnson
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wingate
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa K. Crawford
Represented By: David R. Lowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Georgia Republican Party Inc.
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: Gary Lawkowski
Represented By: David Warrington
Represented By: Harmeet Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Republican National Committee
Represented By: William Bradley Carver
Represented By: David Warrington
Represented By: Gary Lawkowski
Represented By: Harmeet Dhillon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?