Price v. Howard
Plaintiff: Katia Price
Defendant: Michael Howard
Case Number: 1:2022cv02056
Filed: May 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Submission of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (jkb)
July 5, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Katia Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Edmonds, Angelik)
June 21, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Michael Howard. (Radford, James)
June 7, 2022 Filing 5 Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): June 20, 2022, June 21, 2022, June 22, 2022, June 23, 2022, June 24, 2022, June 27, 2022, June 28, 2022, June 29, 2022, June 30, 2022, July 1, 2022, September 21, 2022, September 22, 2022, September 23, 2022, September 23, 2022, September 26, 2022, September 27, 2022, September 28, 2022, September 29, 2022, September 30, 2022, November 23, 2022, November 24, 2022, November 25, 2022 and December 23, 2022, December 26, 2022, December 27, 2022, December 28, 2022, December 29, 2022 and December 30, 2022, by Angelik Edmonds. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmonds, Angelik)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Katia Price. Michael Howard served on 5/31/2022, answer due 6/21/2022. (Edmonds, Angelik)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on May 31, 2022. (ash)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michael Howard. (nmb)
May 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Katia Price (Filing fee $402, receipt number BGANDC-11821142). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katia Price
Represented By: Angelik Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Howard
Represented By: James E. Radford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?