Cashman v. GreyOrange, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Cashman
Defendant: GreyOrange, Inc., Samay Kohli, Unknown Defendant A and Unknown Defendant B
Case Number: 1:2022cv02069
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by GreyOrange, Inc., Samay Kohli identifying Corporate Parent Grey Orange International Inc. for GreyOrange, Inc., Samay Kohli. (Turner, Natalie)
July 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss (FRCP 12(b)(1) and FRCP 12(b)(6) with Brief In Support by GreyOrange, Inc., Samay Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Samay Kohli, #3 Exhibit Letters from Grey Orange to J. Cashman)(Turner, Natalie)
June 3, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jeff Cashman. GreyOrange, Inc. waiver mailed on 5/26/2022, answer due 7/25/2022; Samay Kohli waiver mailed on 5/26/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (Foust, Michael)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 07/02/22 - 07/09/22, by Michael Travis Foust. (Foust, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2022 in order to update docket text
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 5/27/22. (ceo)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to GreyOrange, Inc. on 5/24/2022. (nmb)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jeff Cashman. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11823230). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Offer Letter, #2 Exhibit B: 2019 ESOP Stock Option Plan, #3 Exhibit C: 9-7-21 Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cashman v. GreyOrange, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Cashman
Represented By: A. Lee Parks, Jr
Represented By: Michael Travis Foust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GreyOrange, Inc.
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samay Kohli
Represented By: Natalie Nicole Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?