Walsh v. The Aliera Companies et al
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: The Aliera Companies, Aliera Healthcare, Inc. and Shelley Steele
Case Number: 1:2022cv02145
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Mark H Cohen
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Martin J. Walsh. The Aliera Companies served on 7/11/2022, answer due 8/1/2022., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #3 Proposed Summons filed by The Aliera Companies (Attachments: #1 Summons Certificate of Service)(Han, Christine)
July 12, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Leonard Howard Gerson on behalf of Martin J. Walsh (Gerson, Leonard)
June 22, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Shelley Steele, The Aliera Companies. (Attachments: #1 Aliera2, #2 Steele)(jpa)
June 21, 2022 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Martin J. Walsh served by process server on Shelley Steele, an individual (Attachments: #1 Appendix B provided for Defendant)(Han, Christine)
June 21, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Martin J. Walsh served by process server on Shelley Steele, officer of Aliera (Attachments: #1 Appendix B provided for Defendant)(Han, Christine)
June 21, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Martin J. Walsh served by process server as registered agent for Aliera (Attachments: #1 Appendix B provided for Defendant)(Han, Christine)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 6/8/2022. (dob)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR ERISA VIOLATIONS filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. The Aliera Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Aliera Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliera Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Christine Han
Represented By: Lori M. Beranek
Represented By: Leonard Howard Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?