Dao v. Ploeg et al
Plaintiff: Cuong L. Dao
Defendant: Hien Dao Ploeg and Johannes M. Ploeg
Case Number: 1:2022cv02168
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2022 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cuong L. Dao. (Podesta, Frank)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Court DENIES Plaintiffs #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction as there is no substantial threat of irreparable injury at this time. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/18/22. (jra)
July 18, 2022 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victoria M. Calvert: Evidentiary Hearing on 7/18/2022. The Court declined to hold the Evidentiary Hearing upon hearing argument from counsel. Written Order to follow. (Court Reporter Melissa Brock) (bgt)
July 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE Of Filing July 18 Hearing by Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg (Ploeg, Johannes)
July 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE by Cuong L. Dao re Order, Witness and Exhibit List (Podesta, Frank)
July 12, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 2105 before Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket text only): The Parties are directed to file their witness and exhibits lists with the Court no later than 2PM on Friday, July 15, 2022 in preparation for the hearing on Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunction scheduled for Monday, July 18th at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 7/12/2022. (vs)
July 5, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg. (Ploeg, Johannes)
June 30, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cuong L. Dao. (Podesta, Frank)
June 30, 2022 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Cuong L. Dao.(Podesta, Frank) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
June 18, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Cuong L. Dao. Defendants Hien Dao Ploeg and Johannes M. Ploeg served on 6/14/2022. Answer due 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Podesta, Frank) Modified on 6/22/2022 to edit text (lwb).
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg. (Ploeg, Johannes)
June 16, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hien Dao Ploeg, Johannes M. Ploeg. (Ploeg, Johannes)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORE THE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on June 6, 2022. (lwb)
June 1, 2022 Filing 5 Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 06/06/2022-06/24/2022, 09/23/2022-09/30/2022, 10/14/2022-10/21/2022, by Frank G. Podesta. (Podesta, Frank)
June 1, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Johannes M. Ploeg. (lwb)
June 1, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Hien Dao Ploeg. (lwb)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Cuong L. Dao. (lwb)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION with Jury Demand filed by Cuong L. Dao. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11835985) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lwb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
May 31, 2022 Submission of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (lwb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dao v. Ploeg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cuong L. Dao
Represented By: Frank G. Podesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hien Dao Ploeg
Represented By: Johannes Mitchell Ploeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johannes M. Ploeg
Represented By: Johannes Mitchell Ploeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?