Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mooney et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Michael Mooney, Britt Wright and Penny Flippen
Case Number: 1:2022cv02320
Filed: June 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steven D Grimberg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Compliance re #5 Order (Loomis, Madison)
June 21, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Michael Mooney waiver mailed on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Roback, Harry)
June 16, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Penny Flippen waiver mailed on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Roback, Harry)
June 16, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Britt Wright waiver mailed on 6/14/2022, answer due 8/15/2022. (Roback, Harry)
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance by Harry B. Roback (Roback, Harry)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Ordered by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on June 15, 2022. (ash)
June 10, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Penny Flippen. (tcc)
June 10, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Britt Wright. (tcc)
June 10, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Michael Mooney. (tcc)
June 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mooney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Harry B. Roback
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britt Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penny Flippen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?