Johnson v. Equifax
Plaintiff: CLINTON L JOHNSON
Defendant: Equifax
Case Number: 1:2022cv02535
Filed: June 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: J P Boulee
Referring Judge: John K Larkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:22-cv-00227. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 06/24/2022. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2022.]
June 24, 2022 Submission of #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (aar)
June 24, 2022 Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 7/8/2022. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2022.]
June 23, 2022 Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE MARC T TREADWELL no longer assigned to the case. (vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by CLINTON L JOHNSON.(vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2022.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX,filed by CLINTON L JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Waiver and Notice, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Certified mail receipt and copy of letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Envelope)(vs) [Transferred from Georgia Middle on 6/24/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON L JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?