Moore v. Fulton County Jail
Petitioner: Christopher Maurice Moore
Respondent: Fulton County Jail
Case Number: 1:2022cv02725
Filed: July 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Justin S Anand
Referring Judge: Victoria M Calvert
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Submission of #2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Christopher Maurice Moore, to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
July 20, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Christopher Maurice Moore re #2 Final Report and Recommendation and #3 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation. (lwb)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Service of #2 Final Report and Recommendation by Judge Justin Anand. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Judge Justin Anand on July 19, 2022. (lwb) Modified on 7/20/2022 (lwb).
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Christopher Maurice Moore. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the petition #1 be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 4 and Younger. Leave for Petitioner to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED for the purpose of dismissal only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand on July 19, 2022. (lwb)
July 13, 2022 Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP determination, to Magistrate Judge Justin S. Anand. (kxm)
July 11, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Christopher Maurice Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kxm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Fulton County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christopher Maurice Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fulton County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?