Bean v. Guardian of Georgia, LLC
Plaintiff: Christopher Bean
Defendant: Guardian of Georgia, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv02734
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2101 Worker Adjustment and Retraining Notification Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Christopher Bean. (Jones, Leon)
July 28, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary E Olsen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11950131).. Attorney Mary E. Olsen added appearing on behalf of Christopher Bean (kkh)
July 28, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of M. Vance McCrary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11950138).. Attorney M. Vance McCrary added appearing on behalf of Christopher Bean (kkh)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission of Mary E Olsen Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/28/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission of M. Vance McCrary Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/28/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of M. Vance McCrary Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11950138).by Christopher Bean. (Jones, Leon) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 25, 2022 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Mary E Olsen Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11950131).by Christopher Bean. (Jones, Leon) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 25, 2022 Filing 7 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Mary E. Olsen. Clerk to follow-up by 8/4/2022. (gas)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to M. Vance McCrary. Clerk to follow-up by 8/4/2022. (gas)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission of Stuart J. Miller Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/25/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
July 25, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Stuart J. Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11941541).. Attorney Stuart J. Miller added appearing on behalf of Christopher Bean (kkh)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Stuart J. Miller Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11941541).by Christopher Bean. (Jones, Leon) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher Bean. Guardian of Georgia, LLC waiver mailed on 7/15/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. (Jones, Leon)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 7/13/2022. (bnp)
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Guardian of Georgia, LLC. (ane)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Christopher Bean. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11919400) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bean v. Guardian of Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bean
Represented By: Leon Strickland Jones
Represented By: M. Vance McCrary
Represented By: Mary E. Olsen
Represented By: Stuart J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian of Georgia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?