Gilbert v. US Department of Education
Plaintiff: Selena Gilbert
Defendant: US Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2022cv02908
Filed: July 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
August 16, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Selena Gilbert re #5 Clerk's Judgment, #4 Order. (ddm)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing this action without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and directing the Clerk to close this case. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff files such an amended complaint in the time allowed, the Clerk is to reopen the case and resubmit the matter to the Court for a frivolity review. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 08/15/2022. (ddm)
August 15, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed by Selena Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and directing the Clerk to submit this matter to the District Judge for a frivolity determination under 1915(e)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 08/02/2022. (ddm)
August 2, 2022 Submission of #3 Complaint for a frivolity determination under 1915(e)(2), to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
August 2, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Selena Gilbert re #2 Order. (ddm)
July 26, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (nmb)
July 22, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Selena Gilbert. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. US Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?