Crump v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Victoria Crump
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company and James NeeSmith
Case Number: 1:2022cv03071
Filed: August 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 20109 Federal Railroad Safety Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #14 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald K. Wray, II Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12088443). Attorney Ronald Keith Wray, II added appearing on behalf of James NeeSmith, Norfolk Southern Railway Company (cdg)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER, by docket entry only, granting #14 and #15 Applications for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/30/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(hfm)
September 30, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #15 APPLICATION for Admission of Deborah Casey Brown Pro Hac Vice(Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12088475). Attorney Deborah Casey Brown added appearing on behalf of James NeeSmith, Norfolk Southern Railway Company (cdg)
September 23, 2022 Filing 15 APPLICATION for Admission of Deborah Casey Brown Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12088475).by James NeeSmith, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Golden, Peter) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 23, 2022 Filing 14 APPLICATION for Admission of Ronald K. Wray, II Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12088443).by James NeeSmith, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Golden, Peter) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 22, 2022 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Clarida, Daryl)
September 22, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Golden, Peter)
September 22, 2022 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Railway Company identifying Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation for Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Golden, Peter)
September 22, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by James NeeSmith.(Golden, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 22, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Norfolk Southern Railway Company. Discovery ends on 2/21/2023.(Golden, Peter) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 12, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by James NeeSmith, Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Golden, Peter) Modified on 9/12/2022 (hfm).
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. James NeeSmith and Norfolk Southern Railway Company Answers due 9/23/2022. Ordered by Judge Amy Totenberg on 9/12/22. (hfm)
August 26, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Shuping, Trent)
August 26, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Warshauer, Michael)
August 23, 2022 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Norfolk Southern Railway Company, James NeeSmith. All Defendants. (Golden, Peter)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Victoria Crump Notice of Firm Name Change Titiled: Certificate of Compliance (Warshauer, Michael) Modified on 8/23/2022 to edit text to reflect PDF (dob).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Guidelines to Parties and Counsel in Cases Proceeding Before the Honorable Amy Totenberg. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/18/2022. (dob) Modified on 8/18/2022 to edit text (dob).
August 4, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to James NeeSmith and Norfolk Southern Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Norfolk)(jra)
August 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Victoria Crump. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11973003) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crump v. Norfolk Southern Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Crump
Represented By: Michael J. Warshauer
Represented By: Trent Shuping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Represented By: Deborah Casey Brown
Represented By: Ronald Keith Wray, II
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James NeeSmith
Represented By: Daryl Glenn Clarida
Represented By: Deborah Casey Brown
Represented By: Ronald Keith Wray, II
Represented By: Peter G. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?