Southern Trust Insurance Company v. Chico's FAS, Inc.
Plaintiff: Southern Trust Insurance Company
Defendant: Chico's FAS, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03081
Filed: August 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Property Damage (P.I
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 Initial Disclosures by Southern Trust Insurance Company.(Miller, Eric)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #7 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The Court GRANTS Defendants request for a six-month discovery track. Discovery ends on 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/12/2022. (dob)
September 9, 2022 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chico's FAS, Inc..(Luskin, Robert)
September 7, 2022 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures by Chico's FAS, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Luskin, Robert)
September 6, 2022 Filing 7 JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Chico's FAS, Inc.. (Luskin, Robert)
August 11, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Compliance (Miller, Eric)
August 11, 2022 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Persons by Southern Trust Insurance Company. (Miller, Eric)
August 9, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chico's FAS, Inc..(Luskin, Robert)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
August 4, 2022 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chico's FAS, Inc. Discovery ends on 1/3/2023.(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
August 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Chico's FAS, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-11975493) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Trust Insurance Company v. Chico's FAS, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Trust Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric David Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chico's FAS, Inc.
Represented By: Katelyn Elizabeth Fischer
Represented By: Robert A. Luskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?