Armstrong v. Mengshoel, Jr.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Armstrong
Defendant: Erling Mengshoel, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv03208
Filed: August 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Michael L Brown
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2022 Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (tmf)
August 30, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (tmf)
August 29, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Benjamin Armstrong (Karinshak, Zahra)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Benjamin Armstrong. Erling Mengshoel, Jr. served on 8/22/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Karinshak, Zahra)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
August 12, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Erling Mengshoel, Jr. (gas)
August 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Benjamin Armstrong. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11993394) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Mengshoel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Armstrong
Represented By: Jamil A Favors
Represented By: Zahra S. Karinshak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erling Mengshoel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?