Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mohamed et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: 9224-3708 Quebec, Inc., Rahim Mohamed, Davies (Dave) Wong, Glenn B. Laken, Richard C.S. Tang, Zoltan Nagy, Jeffrey D. Cox, Phillip G. Sewell, Breanne M. Wong, Christophe Merani, Anna Tang, Robert W. Seeley, Richard B. Smith, Christopher R. Smith, H.E. Capital SA, Pop Holdings LTD., Maximum Ventures Holdings LLC, Harmony Ridge Corp., Avatele Group LLC, Distributions Bano and Jason Black
Case Number: 1:2022cv03252
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Eleanor L Ross
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Anna Tang.(Gunter, Justin) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 REVISED ORDER: This Court, having read and considered Defendant Richard Tang's Third Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint #59 , hereby GRANTS same. The filing deadline for Richard Tang's response to the Complaint shall be extended through and including March 17, 2023, without prejudice to seek an additional extension if all Defendants have not been served by that date. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/12/23. (ceo)
January 11, 2023 Filing 61 NOTICE by Richard C.S. Tang of Typographical Error in Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunter, Justin)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. The filing deadline for Richard Tang's response to the Complaint shall be extended through and including March 17, 2023, without prejudice to seek an additional extension if all Defendants have not been served by that date. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 1/11/23. (ceo)
January 9, 2023 Filing 59 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Richard C.S. Tang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gunter, Justin)
January 6, 2023 Filing 58 Specially-Appearing Relief Defendant Jason Black's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Jason Black.(Wilkins, Matthew) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
January 5, 2023 Filing 57 NOTICE Of Filing Consent of Defendant Phillip G. Sewell to Entry of Judgment by Securities and Exchange Commission (Attachments: #1 Consent Judgment as to Defendant Phillip G. Sewell)(Hicks, William)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Richard Tang and Anna Tang shall have until January 17, 2023 to respond to the Complaint. #1 . Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/20/22. (ceo)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Mr. Sewell shall have until January 6, 2023 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/20/22. (ceo)
December 19, 2022 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Zoltan Nagy.(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
December 19, 2022 Filing 53 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) by Phillip G. Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan)
December 19, 2022 Filing 52 Certificate of Interested Persons by Anna Tang. (Hillis, George)
December 19, 2022 Filing 51 Certificate of Interested Persons by Richard C.S. Tang. (Hillis, George)
December 19, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Gunter on behalf of Anna Tang, Richard C.S. Tang (Gunter, Justin)
December 19, 2022 Filing 49 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Richard Tang and Anna Tang to Respond to the Complaint by Anna Tang, Richard C.S. Tang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Hillis, George)
December 19, 2022 Clerks Notation re #52 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures Anna Tang and #51 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures of Richard C.S. Tang. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
December 15, 2022 Clerks Notation re #43 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Phillip G. Sewell. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants Richard Tang and Anna Tang shall have until January 16, 2023, to respond to the Complaint. #1 . Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/13/22. (ceo)
December 13, 2022 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Anna Tang, Richard C.S. Tang. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A - Order)(Hillis, George)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER re #45 Order on Motion for Extension of Time: The Court hereby enters the following schedule of deadlines (See Order for Details). Further, the Court ORDERS that any Defendant who appears in this action after January 1, 2023, shall, through counsel (if represented), confer with counsel for the SEC pursuant to Rule 26(f) within sixteen (16) days of responding to the Complaint, and shall file a JPRDP jointly with the SEC within thirty (30) days of responding to the Complaint or adopt any previously filed JPRDP. Any Defendant who files a response to to the Complaint after January 1, 2023, shall exchange Initial Disclosures with the SEC within thirty (30) days of responding to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/9/22. (ceo)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion. #41 . The Court will issue a separate scheduling order based on Plaintiff's instant motion. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/9/22. (ceo)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Mr. Sewell shall have until December 19, 2022 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 12/9/22. (ceo)
December 9, 2022 Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery ends on 1/30/2023. (ceo)
December 6, 2022 Filing 43 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillip G. Sewell. (Isenberg, Ryan) Modified to edit event text on 12/6/2022 (ceo).
December 6, 2022 Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Phillip G. Sewell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Isenberg, Ryan)
December 2, 2022 Filing 41 MOTION for Extension of Time Postpone Rule 26(f) Conference, Joint Preliminary Report, Initial Disclosures, Commencement of Discovery, and Scheduling Order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gordon, Robert)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: Upon consideration, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion #30 and DIRECTS the Clerk to serve a copy of the summons and Complaint on Defendants Breanne M. Wong, H.E. Capital, SA, and Pop Holdings, Ltd., by mail at the addresses listed in Plaintiff's motion. #30 . The Court DIRECTS the Parties to file any appropriate motions to obtain the Court's leave for any extensions of deadlines the Court has not already granted by previous Orders. #15 #20 . Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/29/22. (ceo)
November 29, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to H.E. Capital SA, Pop Holdings LTD., Breanne M. Wong re #1 Complaint, #2 Electronic Summons Issued. (ceo)
November 21, 2022 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Persons by Rahim Mohamed. (McCormack, Zachary)
November 21, 2022 Clerks Notation re #39 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Rahim Mohamed. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L Ross. (mlb)
November 21, 2022 Clerks Notation re #35 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures of Glenn B. Laken. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 17, 2022 Filing 38 STIPULATION To Extend Defendant Zoltan Nagy's Deadline to File Response to Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gordon, Robert)
November 17, 2022 Filing 37 STIPULATION To Defendant Phillip Sewell's Deadline to File Response To Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gordon, Robert)
November 17, 2022 Filing 36 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Richard B. Smith served on 10/6/2022, answer due 10/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Def. Richard Smith (English Version))(Gordon, Robert)
November 17, 2022 Filing 35 Certificate of Interested Persons by Glenn B. Laken. (Samuel, Donald)
November 16, 2022 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Persons by Christophe Merani. (Mayes, Joshua)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The Court DIRECTS Defendants Glenn B. Laken, Rahim Mohamed, Davies (Dave) Wong, Richard C.S. Tang, Zoltan Nagy, Jeffrey D. Cox, Phillip G. Sewell, Breanne M. Wong, Christophe Merani, Anna Tang, Robert W. Seeley, Richard B. Smith, Christopher R. Smith, H.E. Capital SA, Pop Holdings LTD., Maximum Ventures Holding LLC, Harmony Ridge Corp., Avatele Group LLC, 9224-3708 Quebec, Inc. also known as Distributions Bano and Jason Black, to file Certificates of Interested Persons in accordance with Local Rule 3.3 within seven (7) days from the date of entry of this order. See LR 3.3, NDGa. If Defendants fail to file the Certificate of Interested Persons within the seven (7)-day period, the Court DIRECTS the Clerk to submit this action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/16/22. (ceo)
November 16, 2022 Clerks Notation re #34 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosures by Christophe Merani. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)
November 14, 2022 Filing 32 STIPULATION To Extend Defendant Richard Tang's Deadline To Serve Response To Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gordon, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 31 STIPULATION To Extend Defendant Anna Tang's Deadline To Serve Response To Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gordon, Robert)
November 11, 2022 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Glenn B. Laken.(Samuel, Donald) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 10, 2022 Filing 30 MOTION for Service of Summons and Complaint to Defendant Breanne M. Wong, an individual, and to Defendants H.E. Capital, SA and POP Holdings, Ltd. by Securities and Exchange Commission. (ceo)
November 7, 2022 Filing 28 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Phillip G. Sewell served on 10/31/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
November 7, 2022 Filing 27 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Richard C.S. Tang served on 10/28/2022, answer due 11/18/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
November 7, 2022 Filing 26 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Anna Tang served on 10/25/2022, answer due 11/15/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
November 7, 2022 Filing 25 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Zoltan Nagy served on 10/24/2022, answer due 11/14/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
November 4, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorneys Ira Lee Sorkin and Philip Tafet as to Rahim Mohamed regarding Order on Application for Admission PHV. (mlb)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #22 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Philip Tafet and GRANTING #23 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ira Lee Sorkin. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 11/4/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
November 3, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #22 APPLICATION for Admission of Philip Tafet Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12167982). Attorney Philip Tafet added appearing on behalf of Rahim Mohamed (pdt)
November 3, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Ira Lee Sorkin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12168094). Attorney Ira Lee Sorkin added appearing on behalf of Rahim Mohamed (pdt)
November 1, 2022 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by Rahim Mohamed.(McCormack, Zachary) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
November 1, 2022 Filing 23 APPLICATION for Admission of Ira Lee Sorkin Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12168094).by Rahim Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McCormack, Zachary) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 1, 2022 Filing 22 APPLICATION for Admission of Philip Tafet Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12167982).by Rahim Mohamed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McCormack, Zachary) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
November 1, 2022 Filing 21 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Jason Black served on 10/30/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Mr. Laken shall have until and through November 11, 2022, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/19/22. (ceo)
October 18, 2022 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Glenn B. Laken. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Samuel, Donald)
October 13, 2022 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Defendant Rahim Mohamed's Deadline to Answer the Civil Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Gordon, Robert)
September 27, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing (via email) to Attorney Edward O. Pacer as to Glenn B. Laken regarding #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward O. Pacer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12080223). (mlb)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #16 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Edward O. Pacer. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/27/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
September 26, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #16 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward O. Pacer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12080223). Attorney Edward O. Pacer added appearing on behalf of Glenn B. Laken (pdt)
September 21, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua A. Mayes on behalf of Christophe Merani (Mayes, Joshua)
September 20, 2022 Filing 16 APPLICATION for Admission of Edward O. Pacer Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12080223).by Glenn B. Laken. (Samuel, Donald) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Mr. Laken shall have until October 21, 202 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed in this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/20/22. (ceo)
September 19, 2022 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint by Glenn B. Laken. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Samuel, Donald)
September 19, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #13 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. O'Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12073111). Attorney Kevin J. O'Connor added appearing on behalf of Glenn B. Laken (pdt)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin J. O'Connor. Approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 9/19/22. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(mlb)
September 16, 2022 Filing 13 APPLICATION for Admission of Kevin J. O'Connor Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12073111).by Glenn B. Laken. (Samuel, Donald) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 7, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Christophe Merani. Discovery ends on 6/5/2023.(Alloy, Jason) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
September 6, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Glenn B. Laken served on 9/1/2022, answer due 9/22/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda R. Clark Palmer on behalf of Glenn B. Laken (Clark Palmer, Amanda)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Franklin Samuel on behalf of Glenn B. Laken (Samuel, Donald)
August 26, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Harmony Ridge Corp. served on 8/24/2022, answer due 9/14/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
August 24, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Rahim Mohamed waiver mailed on 8/19/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
August 22, 2022 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Maximum Ventures Holdings LLC served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Avatele Group LLC served on 8/18/2022, answer due 9/8/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
August 18, 2022 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Christophe Merani served on 8/17/2022, answer due 9/7/2022. (Gordon, Robert)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to 9224-3708 Quebec, Inc., Avatele Group LLC, Jason Black, Jeffrey D. Cox, H.E. Capital SA, Harmony Ridge Corp., Glenn B. Laken, Maximum Ventures Holdings LLC, Christophe Merani, Rahim Mohamed, Zoltan Nagy, Pop Holdings LTD., Robert W. Seeley, Phillip G. Sewell, Christopher R. Smith, Richard B. Smith, Anna Tang, Richard C.S. Tang, Breanne M. Wong, Davies (Dave) Wong. (gas)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mohamed et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 9224-3708 Quebec, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rahim Mohamed
Represented By: Ira Lee Sorkin
Represented By: Philip Tafet
Represented By: Zachary J. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davies (Dave) Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn B. Laken
Represented By: Edward O. Pacer
Represented By: Kevin J. O'Connor
Represented By: Amanda R. Clark Palmer
Represented By: Donald Franklin Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C.S. Tang
Represented By: George Wayne Hillis, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoltan Nagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip G. Sewell
Represented By: Ryan Lance Isenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Breanne M. Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christophe Merani
Represented By: Jason Alloy
Represented By: Joshua A. Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Tang
Represented By: George Wayne Hillis, Jr.
Represented By: Justin Gunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.E. Capital SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pop Holdings LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximum Ventures Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harmony Ridge Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avatele Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Distributions Bano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Black
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Represented By: Robert K. Gordon
Represented By: William P. Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?