Securities and Exchange Commission v. Dishinger et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Ann Dishinger, Jerrold I. Palmer, Lawrence M. Palmer and Ann M. Dishinger
Case Number: 1:2022cv03258
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Thomas W Thrash
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Filing 15 CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Defendant Lawrence M. Palmer in the amount of $99,723.66. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/12/2022. (jra)
October 12, 2022 Filing 14 CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Defendant Jerrold I. Palmer in the amount of $107,701.44. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/12/2022. (jra)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The SEC's Motion For Entry Of Consent Judgment As to Defendants Jerrold I. Palmer and Lawrence M. Palmer #10 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/12/2022. (jra)
October 12, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Margaret Gembala Nelson re #13 Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment, #14 Consent Judgment, #15 Consent Judgment. (jra)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER (by docket entry) granting #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Ann M. Dishinger Answer due 11/29/2022. Ordered by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/7/2022. (jeh) Modified on 10/7/2022 (jeh).
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Todd S. Pugh. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 10/6/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
October 6, 2022 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ann M. Dishinger. (Kelehear, Zachary) Modified on 10/11/2022 (jra).
October 5, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Todd S Pugh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12095399). Attorney Todd S. Pugh added appearing on behalf of Lawrence M. Palmer (pdt)
September 29, 2022 Filing 10 Motion For Entry Of Consent Judgment As to Defendants Jerrold I. Palmer and Lawrence M. Palmer by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Murnahan, W.) Modified on 10/3/2022 (jra).
September 27, 2022 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Todd S Pugh Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12095399).by Lawrence M. Palmer. (Habachy, Joseph) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Susan Pavlow. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/12/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jra)
September 12, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Susan Pavlow re #8 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jra)
September 9, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Pavlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12054019). Attorney Susan M. Pavlow added appearing on behalf of Ann M. Dishinger (pdt).
September 8, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Susan Pavlow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12054019).by Ann M. Dishinger. (Kelehear, Zachary) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
August 30, 2022 Filing 6 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Susan M. Pavlow. Clerk to follow-up by 9/9/2022. (cdg)
August 30, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Todd S. Pugh. Clerk to follow-up by 9/9/2022. (cdg)
August 30, 2022 Filing 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Margaret Gembala Nelson. Clerk to follow-up by 9/9/2022. (cdg)
August 18, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Ann M. Dishinger waiver mailed on 8/15/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. (Loomis, Madison)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ann Dishinger. (gas)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Defendant Jerrold I. Palmer, #2 Final Judgment as to Defendant of Jerrold I. Palmer, #3 Consent of Defendant Lawrence M. Palmer, #4 Final Judgment as to Defendant Lawrence M. Palmer, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Dishinger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Madison Graham Loomis
Represented By: W. Shawn Murnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Dishinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerrold I. Palmer
Represented By: Margaret Gembala Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence M. Palmer
Represented By: Todd S. Pugh
Represented By: Joseph S. Habachy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann M. Dishinger
Represented By: Susan M. Pavlow
Represented By: Zachary J. Kelehear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?