Booker v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert L Booker
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., American Zurich Insurance Co., Sedgwick Claims Management Services and Complete Medical Management
Case Number: 1:2022cv03343
Filed: August 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Steve C Jones
Referring Judge: Amy Totenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint; and further supplement pleadings; and for leave to Permit Joinder of Additional Parties; and for Permission to Serve Notice of this Motion upon Additional Parties filed by Robert L Booker. (ddm)
September 29, 2022 Submission of #11 First Amended Complaint for a frivolity review, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
September 28, 2022 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert L Booker.(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
September 15, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice. (ddm)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist--
September 15, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert L Booker re #10 Clerk's Judgment, #9 Order. (ddm)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) and directs the Clerk to close this case. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff files such an amended complaint in the time allowed, the Clerk is DIRECTED to reopen the case and resubmit the matter to the Court for a frivolity review. The Court warns Plaintiff that a failure to correct the deficiencies identified in this Order may result in dismissal of claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 09/14/2022. (ddm)
September 14, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. (ddm)
September 13, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Removal filed by Robert L Booker. (ddm)
September 1, 2022 Filing 7 Second Supplemental Memorandum and MOTION for Assertion of Ancillary Jurisdiction filed by Robert L Booker. (ddm)
August 25, 2022 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support of #5 PETITION for Temporary and Injunctive Relief filed by Robert L Booker. (ddm)
August 23, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert L Booker re #2 Order Reassigning Case. (dob)
August 22, 2022 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support of PETITION for Temporary and Injunctive Relief filed by Robert L Booker. (ddm)
August 22, 2022 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed by Robert L Booker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #1 . Service of process shall not issue at the present time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 08/22/2022. (ddm)
August 22, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (dob)
August 22, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to District Judge Amy Totenberg. (dob)
August 22, 2022 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Robert L Booker re #3 Order. (ddm)
August 22, 2022 Submission of #4 Complaint for a frivolity determination pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (ddm)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steve C. Jones for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-cv-3343-AT. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 8/19/2022. (dob) Modified on 8/22/2022 to edit filing date (dob).
August 19, 2022 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert L Booker. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dob)
August 19, 2022 Submission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Complaint contains Petition for Temporary and Injunctive Relef, to Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas. (dob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booker v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Zurich Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Medical Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?