Park 80 Hotels, LLC et al v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Park 80 Hotels, LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Mayur Patel, JSK Exton LLC, JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc., Parmattma Corporation, Synergy Hotel, LLC and PH Lodging Tomball, LLC
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group and IHG Technology Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv03709
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: Leigh Martin May
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit to Amended Complaint by JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc., JSK Exton LLC, PH Lodging Tomball, LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, Synergy Hotel, LLC re #17 Amended Complaint,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Gibson, MaryBeth)
November 2, 2022 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Technology Solutions, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.with Jury Demand filed by Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Synergy Hotel, LLC, JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc..(Gibson, MaryBeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 10/12/2022. (kxm)
October 12, 2022 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Plaintiffs to Amend Complaint and Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint re: #1 Complaint,, Consent Motion to Extend Amendment and Response Deadlines by Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Technology Solutions, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Ronald)
October 12, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by John Hartshorn Elliott on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Technology Solutions, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Elliott, John)
October 12, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne McDonough Horn Baroody on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Technology Solutions, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Baroody, Anne)
October 12, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Eric Zweigel on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Technology Solutions, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Zweigel, Scott)
October 12, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr on behalf of Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC, IHG Technology Solutions, LLC, Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (Coleman, Ronald)
October 5, 2022 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Synergy Hotel, LLC, JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc.. Six Continents Hotels, Inc. served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
October 5, 2022 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Synergy Hotel, LLC, JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc.. IHG Technology Solutions, LLC served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
October 5, 2022 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Synergy Hotel, LLC, JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc.. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC served on 9/28/2022, answer due 10/19/2022. (Gibson, MaryBeth)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission of Mark Ian Fishbein Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/29/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
September 29, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Ian Fishbein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12087268). Attorney Mark Fishbein added appearing on behalf of JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc., JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, Synergy Hotel, LLC (cdg)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER granting #6 Application for Admission of Andrew Peter Bleiman Pro Hac Vice. Ruled on by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/29/2022. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(bnp)
September 29, 2022 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Peter Bleiman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12087249). Attorney Andrew P. Bleiman added appearing on behalf of JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc., JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel (cdg)
September 23, 2022 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark Ian Fishbein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12087268).by JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc., JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, Synergy Hotel, LLC. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 23, 2022 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew Peter Bleiman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12087249).by JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc., JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, Synergy Hotel, LLC. (Gibson, MaryBeth) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/15/2022. (bnp)
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to IHG Technology Solutions, LLC. (gas)
September 15, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Six Continents Hotels, Inc. (gas)
September 15, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC. (gas)
September 15, 2022 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Parmattma Corporation, Mayur Patel, JSK Exton LLC, PL Hotels, LLC, Park 80 Hotels, LLC, Synergy Hotel, LLC, JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12068199) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(gas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park 80 Hotels, LLC et al v. Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Park 80 Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PL Hotels, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayur Patel
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JSK Exton LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY Z. Kuber Hospitality, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parmattma Corporation
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergy Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH Lodging Tomball, LLC
Represented By: Andrew P. Bleiman
Represented By: Justin Michael Klein
Represented By: Justin E. Proper
Represented By: Mark Fishbein
Represented By: MaryBeth Vassil Gibson
Represented By: N. Nickolas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday Hospitality Franchising, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: John Hartshorn Elliott
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Eric Zweigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Continents Hotels, Inc. doing business as Intercontinental Hotels Group
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: John Hartshorn Elliott
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Eric Zweigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHG Technology Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Anne McDonough Horn Baroody
Represented By: John Hartshorn Elliott
Represented By: Ronald Thomas Coleman, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Eric Zweigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?